Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business and Economic Development - Film Production Activity Tax Credit Program
Sponsored by
Senators Kasemeyer, McFadden, Colburn, DeGrange, Getty, Jones-Rodwell, King, Manno, Peters, and Robey
Status
In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing from $7,500,000 to $18,500,000 the amount of film production activity income tax credit certificates that the Secretary of Business and Economic Development may issue during fiscal year 2015.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0520
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {209230/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
4/05/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {105564/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate Fisher) Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Fisher) {533229/1 Rejected (41-91)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (88-47)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Senators DeGrange, Jones-Rodwell, and Manno
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
House Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Delegates Hixson, F. Turner, and Barve
Proceedings
70
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/17/2014 2/18/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/26/2014 2/27/2014 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/14/2014 3/14/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments {209230/1 Report Adopted 45
Senate 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Senate 3/17/2014 3/12/2014 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 46
House 3/18/2014 3/15/2014 First Reading Ways and Means 51
House 3/25/2014 3/25/2014 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/25/2014 3/25/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 3/25/2014 3/25/2014 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2014 4/05/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable with Amendments {105564/1 Report Adopted 67
House 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Special Order until later today (Delegate Fisher) Adopted 68
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Fisher) {533229/1 Rejected (41-91) 69
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (88-47) 69
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Senate Requests House Recede 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Conference Committee Appointed 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Senators DeGrange, Jones-Rodwell, and Manno 65
House 4/07/2014 4/03/2014 House Refuses to Recede 70
House 4/07/2014 4/03/2014 Conference Committee Appointed 70
House 4/07/2014 4/03/2014 Delegates Hixson, F. Turner, and Barve 70
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-730 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM