Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Minority Business Enterprises - Not-for-Profit Entities
Sponsored by
Senator Pugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 343
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring specified entities to include in specified contracts a requirement for procuring janitorial products; excluding a not-for-profit entity organized to promote the interests of physically or mentally disabled individuals from a specified definition of minority business enterprise; prohibiting specified contracts from being counted as part of a unit of State government's total dollar value of procurement contracts; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0048
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0156 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013, July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {744633/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (28-16)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/07/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 343
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2013 3/16/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2013 3/16/2013 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Pugh) Adopted 47
Senate 3/18/2013 3/16/2013 Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator Pugh) Adopted 47
Senate 3/18/2013 3/16/2013 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47
Senate 3/20/2013 3/20/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/29/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Favorable with Amendments {744633/1 Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Third Reading Passed (28-16) 59
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 60
House 4/06/2013 4/06/2013 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Second Reading Passed 67
House 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 69
Senate 4/09/2013 4/07/2013 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 343
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-101 through 14-103, 14-110, 14-301, 14-302 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM