Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 10/28/2020 11:25:12 AM
Wednesday, October 28, 2020
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
Created: 10/6/2020 3:25 PM
Government Operations and Health Facilities Subcommittee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
Update from the University of Maryland Medical System (UMMS); Update from Open Meetings Compliance Board, PIA Compliance Board, and Public Access Ombudsman

Other
Joint Committee on Cybersecurity, Information Technology and Biotechnology
Created: 10/13/2020 11:24 AM
10:00 AM - On-Line Meeting
10:30 AM - On-Line Meeting
(1) The status and progress of State information technology modernization;
(3) Potential committee legislation for the 2021 legislative session.
(2) Cybersecurity for State government, local governments, and small businesses in the State; and

Joint Covid-19 Response Legislative Workgroup
Created: 10/20/2020 9:09 AM
10:00 AM - Zoom Meeting

Legislative Policy Committee
Created: 10/23/2020 2:01 PM
4:00 PM - Zoom Meeting
Governor's proposal to transfer a total of $250 million from the Revenue Stabilization Account to various agencies to address COVID-19 related impacts to businesses.

Maryland Small Business Retirement Savings Board
Created: 10/15/2020 3:07 PM
9:30 AM to 11:30 AM - Zoom Meeting
9:30 AM to 12:00 PM - Zoom Meeting
Meeting Video
Meeting ID: 838 1828 2911
Passcode: 724815
Dial in Number: 301-715-8592
General Meeting and Closed Session (if necessary).
(Added - 10/21/2020 4:28 PM)
General Meeting
(Removed - 10/21/2020 4:28 PM)