Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Fairness in Negotiations Act and the Public School Labor Relations Board - Sunset Repeal and Reporting Requirements
Sponsored by
Senators Raskin, Feldman, Kelley, Klausmeier, Mathias, Middleton, Pugh, and Ramirez
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 369
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the termination date of specified provisions relating to collective bargaining for public school employees and the Public School Labor Relations Board; requiring the Board to report to specified committees of the General Assembly on information and recommendations regarding cases heard and decided by the Board on or before August 1, 2018; requiring the Board to report to specified committees of the General Assembly regarding administrative procedures and open meetings provisions on or before December 1, 2014; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1181
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2014
Legislative Date
2/21/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2014
Legislative Date
3/16/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {877771/1
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2014
Legislative Date
3/16/2014
Action
Laid Over (Senator Getty) Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {877771/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (38-8)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
4/05/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-43)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 369
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2014 2/21/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/19/2014 3/20/2014 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/20/2014 3/20/2014 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/20/2014 3/21/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/21/2014 3/16/2014 Favorable with Amendments {877771/1 50
Senate 3/21/2014 3/16/2014 Laid Over (Senator Getty) Adopted 50
Senate 3/24/2014 3/17/2014 Favorable with Amendments {877771/1 Report Adopted 51
Senate 3/24/2014 3/17/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
Senate 3/25/2014 3/18/2014 Third Reading Passed (38-8) 52
House 3/26/2014 3/21/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 57
House 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/04/2014 4/04/2014 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2014 4/05/2014 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 65
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Third Reading Passed (93-43) 68
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 369
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM