Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - BRAC Revitalization and Incentive Zones - Extraordinary Development District
Sponsored by
Senator Peters
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Secretary of Commerce to designate, in a calendar year, an additional BRAC Revitalization and Incentive Zone that includes a specified extraordinary development district in which a federal law enforcement agency is located; increasing by one the number of BRAC Zones a county may receive if the zone includes a specified development district; increasing from 10 to 20 the number of years the Secretary may designate a specified area as a BRAC Zone if the zone includes a specified development district; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1553
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/01/2016 3/02/2016 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing 3/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-1301, 5-1304 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM