Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Modification of Sentences
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the State to appeal a specified sentence modification to a three-judge review panel; authorizing a three-judge review panel to review a specified sentence modification; prohibiting a three-judge review panel from increasing a specified sentence in a specified manner; requiring that the court provide notice to the State if a three-judge review panel changes a specified sentence in a specified manner; and applying the Act retroactively.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Emergency Bill
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0121 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Modification of Sentences
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Modification of Sentences
Senate 2/21/2017 2/22/2017 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-234, 8-105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM