Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Law - Lead Testing and Behavioral Health Assessment
Sponsored by
Senators Conway and Pinsky
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, instead of authorizing, the juvenile court to order a child to undergo blood lead level testing if the child's parent or guardian consents; requiring, instead of authorizing, the juvenile court to direct the Department of Juvenile Services or another qualified agency to make a certain study concerning the child; requiring that, as part of the study, the Department conduct a comprehensive behavioral health assessment of the child; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0479
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Lead Testing and Behavioral Health Assessment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Lead Testing and Behavioral Health Assessment
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-8A-16.1, 3-8A-17 )
(   4-205, 4-205.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM