Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Wetlands and Waterways Program – State–Owned Lakes – Structural Shoreline Stabilization
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying that the application fee for a structural shoreline stabilization project that impacts a wetland or waterway of a State-owned lake may not exceed $250; and requiring the Department of the Environment, in conjunction with the Department of Natural Resources, to identify up to three types of structural stabilization practices that may be implemented on a wetland or waterway of a State-owned lake.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1077
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Wetlands and Waterways Program – State–Owned Lakes – Structural Shoreline Stabilization
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/20/2018 3/20/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-203.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM