Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Assembly Areas - State-Funded Construction or Renovation - Assistive Listening System Requirement
Sponsored by
Senator Muse
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring certain recipients of State funds to install an assistive listening system in an assembly area during construction or renovation of the assembly area under certain circumstances; requiring the Department of General Services to establish a certain waiver process and a certain penalty process relating to the requirement to install an assistive listening system in an assembly area during construction or renovation of the assembly area; authorizing the Department to adopt certain regulations; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0138
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Assembly Areas - State-Funded Construction or Renovation - Assistive Listening System Requirement
Senate 2/15/2018 2/16/2018 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM