Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education) and Senators King, Madaleno, Pinsky, Waugh, Astle, Benson, Brochin, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kasemeyer, Kelley, Klausmeier, Lee, Manno, McFadden, Middleton, Miller, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Peters, Ramirez, Robinson, Rosapepe, Smith, Young, Zirkin, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education, in collaboration with certain entities, to establish a certain outreach program; establishing the Maryland Early Literacy Initiative in the Department; establishing the Learning in Extended Academic Programs (LEAP) grant program; altering certain eligibility requirements for the Teaching Fellows for Maryland scholarship program; establishing a Career and Technology Education Innovation Grant; extending the final report date for the Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1415
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Education - Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education
Senate 2/15/2018 2/16/2018 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-2201, 18-2202, 18-2203, 18-2204, 18-2205 through 18-2208, 18-2209, 18-2210, 21-205, 2-306, 5-216, 7-101.2, 7-1702, 7-1704, 7-2001 through 7-2006 )
(   2016, 2017 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM