Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education - Sale of Textbooks - Audits
Sponsored by
Senators Conway, Benson, Montgomery, Simonaire, and Young
Status
In the House - Rereferred to Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Office of Legislative Audits to include in specified audits of specified institutions of higher education an evaluation of the institution's compliance with specified provisions of law relating to the sale of textbooks.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {234033/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2014
Legislative Date
3/16/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/06/2014 3/07/2014 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2014 3/20/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/20/2014 3/15/2014 Favorable with Amendments {234033/1 Report Adopted 49
Senate 3/20/2014 3/15/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Senate 3/21/2014 3/16/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 50
House 3/24/2014 3/19/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 55
House 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Rereferred to Appropriations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-112 )
(   2-1220, 2-1221 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM