Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning - Transfer of Senior Community Service Employment Program
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Aging)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 468
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning to administer any community service employment programs delegated to the State under Title V of the federal Older Americans Act of 1965; requiring the responsibility for carrying out the Senior Community Service Employment Program to be transferred to the Division on July 1, 2016; requiring that specified appropriations be transferred to the Division on July 1, 2016; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
55A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 468
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/22/2016 2/22/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/01/2016 3/02/2016 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/23/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 51
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Second Reading Passed 51
Senate 3/25/2016 3/23/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 52
House 3/28/2016 3/23/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 55A
House 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 4/05/2016 4/05/2016 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2016 4/05/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 4/05/2016 4/05/2016 Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/07/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Returned Passed 63A
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 468
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM