Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick County - Linking Youth to New Experiences (LYNX) High School
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Linking Youth to New Experiences (LYNX) High School at Frederick High School in Frederick County; providing that the LYNX High School is a public school under the authority of the County Board of Education and the County Superintendent of Schools; providing that the purpose of the LYNX High School is to provide individualized, self-directed learning opportunities for every student in accordance with a personal plan for success; requiring the County Superintendent to develop a specified plan on or before September 30, 2016; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1615
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {444937/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-1)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {935669/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/25/2016 2/26/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/01/2016 3/02/2016 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/23/2016 3/25/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/25/2016 3/23/2016 Favorable with Amendments {444937/1 Report Adopted 52
Senate 3/25/2016 3/23/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 53
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 56
House 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Favorable with Amendments {935669/1 Report Adopted 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendments 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Passed Enrolled 65
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-1701 through 7-1705 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM