Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax Credit - Baltimore County - Leadership Through Athletics, Inc.
Sponsored by
Senator Kasemeyer
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 616
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of Baltimore County to grant, by law, a property tax credit against the county property tax imposed on real or personal property that is owned or leased by Leadership Through Athletics, Inc.; providing that the amount of the credit under the Act shall accrue to Leadership Through Athletics, Inc. under certain circumstances; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2018.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {255665/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 616
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Property Tax Credit - Baltimore County - Leadership Through Athletics, Inc.
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Hearing 3/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable Adopted 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Property Tax Credit - Baltimore County - Leadership Through Athletics, Inc.
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48CClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Ways and Means 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2018 3/20/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {255665/1 Adopted 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Property Tax Credit - Baltimore County - Leadership Through Athletics, Inc.
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 616
Text - Chapter - Property Tax Credit - Baltimore County - Leadership Through Athletics, Inc.
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page