Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Natural Resources - Solar Generation Facilities - Pollinator-Friendly Designation
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton, Jennings, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Klausmeier, Mathias, Reilly, Rosapepe, and Oaks
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 372
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the power plant research program of the Department of Natural Resources to include in its research an evaluation of the pollinator benefits that would occur under a pollinator-friendly vegetation management standard or pollinator habitat plan implemented on the land on which a proposed or an existing ground-mounted solar generation facility is located; requiring the Department to adopt a specified Solar Site Pollinator Habitat Planning and Assessment scorecard; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {957570/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {153696/1 Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Delegate Healey) Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {953626/1 (Delegate Healey)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Davis) Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {953626/1 (Delegate Healey) Withdrawn
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (141-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 372
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Power Plant Research Program - Solar Generation Facilities - Pollinator-Friendly Designation
Senate 2/28/2017 3/01/2017 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Favorable with Amendments {957570/1 Adopted 51
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
Text - Third - Department of Natural Resources - Solar Generation Facilities - Pollinator-Friendly Designation
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 52
House 3/27/2017 3/22/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 56
House 4/04/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Floor Committee Amendment {153696/1 Adopted 68
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Delegate Healey) Adopted 68
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Floor Amendment {953626/1 (Delegate Healey) 68
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Davis) Adopted 68
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Floor Amendment {953626/1 (Delegate Healey) Withdrawn 69
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (141-0) 69
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (36-0) 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Department of Natural Resources - Solar Generation Facilities - Pollinator-Friendly Designation
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 372
Text - Chapter - Department of Natural Resources - Solar Generation Facilities - Pollinator-Friendly Designation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-303, 3-303.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM