Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Horse Racing - Maryland International and Preakness Stakes Incentives - Modifications
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Klausmeier, Mathias, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the amount available for a purse for the Maryland International thoroughbred race by specifying an amount up to $500,000; specifying that the Maryland International is a graded stakes race; authorizing the Maryland International to continue to be conducted after June 30, 2019; requiring that certain money distributed to the Racing Special Fund and paid for certain purposes remain available for those purposes and may not be used for any other purpose; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1721
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018, July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {937375/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Horse Racing - Maryland International and Preakness Stakes Incentives - Modifications
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Favorable with Amendments {937375/1 Adopted 52
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Text - Third - Horse Racing - Maryland International and Preakness Stakes Incentives - Modifications
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 53
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 54
House 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/04/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 60
House 4/07/2018 3/31/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 65
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185
Text - Chapter - Horse Racing - Maryland International and Preakness Stakes Incentives - Modifications
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-403, 11-522.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM