Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation - Home Improvement Contracts
Sponsored by
Senator Bates
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing certain home improvement retailers to obtain the full contract price of a home improvement contract before or at the time of execution of the contract under certain circumstances; requiring certain home improvement retailers to post an irrevocable letter of credit in a certain amount not to exceed $2,000,000 for a certain purpose; authorizing certain owners to file a complaint with the Maryland Home Improvement Commission under certain circumstances; requiring the Commission to investigate certain complaints; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0674
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Business Regulation - Home Improvement Contracts
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Business Regulation - Home Improvement Contracts
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 60
Senate 4/03/2018 4/03/2018 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-212, 8-501.1, 8-617 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM