Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement - State Vehicle Fleet - Zero-Emission Vehicles
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State to ensure that certain percentages of the light-duty vehicles purchased for the State vehicle fleet are zero-emission vehicles, beginning in certain fiscal years; requiring, by December 1 each year, certain units of State government to submit to the General Assembly a report on the total number of light-duty vehicles and the number of zero-emission, light-duty vehicles purchased by the units in the preceding 12 months, as well as an explanation for the purchase of each non-zero-emission vehicle in the preceding 12 months; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Procurement - State Vehicle Fleet - Zero-Emission Vehicles
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Procurement - State Vehicle Fleet - Zero-Emission Vehicles
Senate 3/08/2018 3/09/2018 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   23-206.4 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM