Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crisis in Waiting Periods for Veterans with Disabilities to Receive Services from the Federal Veterans Benefits Administration
Sponsored by
Senators Peters, Astle, Benson, Brinkley, Brochin, Colburn, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Dyson, Edwards, Ferguson, Forehand, Frosh, Garagiola, Getty, Gladden, Glassman, Jacobs, Jennings, Jones-Rodwell, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Miller, Montgomery, Muse, Pinsky, Pipkin, Pugh, Ramirez, Raskin, Reilly, Robey, Rosapepe, Shank, Simonaire, Stone, Young, and Zirkin
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Urging that specified actions be taken by Congress, the federal Department of Veterans Affairs, and the federal Veterans Benefits Administration to address the long waiting periods for veterans with disabilities who file disability compensation claims with the Baltimore Regional Office to receive services and compensation from the federal Veterans Benefits Administration; and providing that a copy of the resolution be forwarded by the Department of Legislative Services to specified individuals.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {394734/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/24/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/29 (Senator Robey) Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
59
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/19/2013 2/20/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/26/2013 3/27/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2013 3/23/2013 Favorable with Amendments {394734/1 Report Adopted 54
Senate 3/27/2013 3/23/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
Senate 3/28/2013 3/24/2013 Special Order until 3/29 (Senator Robey) Adopted 55
Senate 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
House 4/01/2013 3/26/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 59
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM