Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

SJ0003


JR0001

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Governor's Salary Commission - Salary Recommendations for Governor and Lieutenant Governor
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Governor's Salary Commission)
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 21A(d) of the Maryland Constitution Assigned a resolution number - Joint Resolution 1
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the salaries to be paid the Governor and Lieutenant Governor, as directed by Article II, Section 21A of the Maryland Constitution, for the 4-year term of office beginning January 21, 2015.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HJ0003
Bill File Type: Regular
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2014
Legislative Date
1/20/2014
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 21A(d) of the Maryland Constitution
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Assigned a resolution number - Joint Resolution 1
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2014 1/16/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/20/2014 1/20/2014 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 Hearing 1/29 at 1:45 p.m.
Post Passage 3/12/2014 3/07/2014 Enacted under Article II, Section 21A(d) of the Maryland Constitution
Post Passage 3/12/2014 3/07/2014 Assigned a resolution number - Joint Resolution 1
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM