Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Apprentices

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0381 (SB0237)
Title
Human Relations - Employment Discrimination - Protections for Interns
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0473 (SB0787)
Title
Economic Development - Green Business Incentive Zones
Sponsor
Delegate Summers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0687
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 - Baltimore City - Franklin Entrepreneurial and Apprenticeship Center
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1119 (SB0877)
Title
Board of Electricians - Licensing and Regulation of Electricians - Phase Out of Apprentice, Journeyperson, and Master Level Local Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Haddaway-Riccio
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1207 /CH0646
Title
Division of Labor and Industry - Youth Apprenticeship Advisory Committee
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1218 /CH0565 (SB0854/CH0564)
Title
State Board of Pharmacy - Registered Pharmacy Interns
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1338
Title
State Construction Projects - Work-Based Learning and Local Hiring
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0054 /CH0120
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Apprenticeship and Training Council
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0237 (HB0381)
Title
Human Relations - Employment Discrimination - Protections for Interns
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0523
Title
Task Force to Study a Program for Interest-Free Loans to STEM College Students in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0787 (HB0473)
Title
Economic Development - Green Business Incentive Zones
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0854 /CH0564 (HB1218/CH0565)
Title
State Board of Pharmacy - Registered Pharmacy Interns
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0877 (HB1119)
Title
Board of Electricians - Licensing and Regulation of Electricians - Phase Out of Local Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1102
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 - Baltimore City - Franklin Entrepreneurial and Apprenticeship Center
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0381 (SB0237) Human Relations - Employment Discrimination - Protections for Interns Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0473 (SB0787) Economic Development - Green Business Incentive Zones Delegate Summers 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0687 Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 - Baltimore City - Franklin Entrepreneurial and Apprenticeship Center Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1119 (SB0877) Board of Electricians - Licensing and Regulation of Electricians - Phase Out of Apprentice, Journeyperson, and Master Level Local Licenses Delegate Haddaway-Riccio 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1207 /CH0646 Division of Labor and Industry - Youth Apprenticeship Advisory Committee Delegate Simmons 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 646
Economic Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1218 /CH0565 (SB0854/CH0564) State Board of Pharmacy - Registered Pharmacy Interns Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 565
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1338 State Construction Projects - Work-Based Learning and Local Hiring Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0054 /CH0120 Labor and Employment - Maryland Apprenticeship and Training Council Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 120
Finance
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0237 (HB0381) Human Relations - Employment Discrimination - Protections for Interns Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0523 Task Force to Study a Program for Interest-Free Loans to STEM College Students in Maryland Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0787 (HB0473) Economic Development - Green Business Incentive Zones Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0854 /CH0564 (HB1218/CH0565) State Board of Pharmacy - Registered Pharmacy Interns Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 564
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0877 (HB1119) Board of Electricians - Licensing and Regulation of Electricians - Phase Out of Local Licenses Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1102 Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 - Baltimore City - Franklin Entrepreneurial and Apprenticeship Center Senator Jones-Rodwell 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM