Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Apprentices

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0370 (SB0777)
Title
Prevailing Wage - Payment for Apprenticeship Programs
Sponsor
Delegate McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0499
Title
State Board of Cosmetologists - Licensing - Hair Braiders, Cosmetology Assistants, and Microdermabrasion
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0538 (SB0075)
Title
Task Force to Study a Program for Interest-Free Loans to STEM College Students in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0587 /CH0262
Title
State Board of Barbers - Limited License - Barber-Stylist
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0942 /CH0140 (SB0772)
Title
Apprenticeship Pilot Program - Apprenticeship Maryland
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1048
Title
Vehicle Laws - Drivers' Education - Licensing
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1124
Title
State Board of Cosmetology - Natural Hair Care Stylist - Licensure
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1226 /CH0120
Title
Apprenticeship and Training - Replacement of Obsolete References
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0075 (HB0538)
Title
Task Force to Study a Program for Interest-Free Loans to STEM College Students in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0616
Title
Board of Electricians - Licensing and Regulation of Electricians - Phase Out of Apprentice, Journeyperson, and Master Level Local Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0772 (HB0942/CH0140)
Title
Apprenticeship Pilot Program - Apprenticeship Maryland
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0777 (HB0370)
Title
Prevailing Wage - Payment for Apprenticeship Programs
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0907
Title
Ironworkers - Apprenticeship Program and Certification Program and Use of Certified Ironworkers on Construction Projects
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0370 (SB0777) Prevailing Wage - Payment for Apprenticeship Programs Delegate McCray 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0499 State Board of Cosmetologists - Licensing - Hair Braiders, Cosmetology Assistants, and Microdermabrasion Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0538 (SB0075) Task Force to Study a Program for Interest-Free Loans to STEM College Students in Maryland Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0587 /CH0262 State Board of Barbers - Limited License - Barber-Stylist Delegate Davis 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262
Economic Matters
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0942 /CH0140 (SB0772) Apprenticeship Pilot Program - Apprenticeship Maryland Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 140
Economic Matters
3/09/2015 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
Finance
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1048 Vehicle Laws - Drivers' Education - Licensing Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1124 State Board of Cosmetology - Natural Hair Care Stylist - Licensure Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1226 /CH0120 Apprenticeship and Training - Replacement of Obsolete References Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 120
Economic Matters
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0075 (HB0538) Task Force to Study a Program for Interest-Free Loans to STEM College Students in Maryland Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0616 Board of Electricians - Licensing and Regulation of Electricians - Phase Out of Apprentice, Journeyperson, and Master Level Local Licenses Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0772 (HB0942/CH0140) Apprenticeship Pilot Program - Apprenticeship Maryland President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/09/2015 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0777 (HB0370) Prevailing Wage - Payment for Apprenticeship Programs Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0907 Ironworkers - Apprenticeship Program and Certification Program and Use of Certified Ironworkers on Construction Projects Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Finance
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM