Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Apprentices

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0108 (SB0457)
Title
Capital Budget - Construction Projects - Apprenticeship Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0290 /CH0404 (SB0545/CH0403)
Title
Labor and Employment - Apprenticeship Career Training in Our Neighborhoods (ACTION) Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0676 /CH0495
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Apprenticeship and Training Council - Annual Report
Sponsor
Delegate McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0999 /CH0702 (SB0905/CH0701)
Title
Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1187 (SB0922)
Title
Career Apprenticeship Opportunity Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1223
Title
Natural Resources - Apprentice Hunting License - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1615 (SB1126/CH0470)
Title
Frederick County - Linking Youth to New Experiences (LYNX) High School
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0007
Title
Prevailing Wage Law - Applicability - Elementary and Secondary School Construction
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0092 /CH0343
Title
Planned Apprenticeship Standards and On-the-Job Training Activities - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0273
Title
Income Tax Credit - Apprenticeship and Training - Work-Based Learning Program
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0457 (HB0108)
Title
Capital Budget - Construction Projects - Apprenticeship Requirements
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0545 /CH0403 (HB0290/CH0404)
Title
Labor and Employment - Apprenticeship Career Training in Our Neighborhoods (ACTION) Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0905 /CH0701 (HB0999/CH0702)
Title
Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0922 (HB1187)
Title
Career Apprenticeship Opportunity Act of 2016
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1014
Title
Maryland Clean Energy Jobs Act of 2016
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1126 /CH0470 (HB1615)
Title
Frederick County - Linking Youth to New Experiences (LYNX) High School
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0108 (SB0457) Capital Budget - Construction Projects - Apprenticeship Requirements Delegate McCray 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/03/2016 - 3:00 PM
HB0290 /CH0404 (SB0545/CH0403) Labor and Employment - Apprenticeship Career Training in Our Neighborhoods (ACTION) Program - Establishment Delegate McCray 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 404
Economic Matters
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0676 /CH0495 Labor and Employment - Maryland Apprenticeship and Training Council - Annual Report Delegate McCray 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 495
Economic Matters
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/06/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0999 /CH0702 (SB0905/CH0701) Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 702
Ways and Means
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1187 (SB0922) Career Apprenticeship Opportunity Act of 2016 Delegate McCray 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1223 Natural Resources - Apprentice Hunting License - Establishment Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1615 (SB1126/CH0470) Frederick County - Linking Youth to New Experiences (LYNX) High School Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules
SB0007 Prevailing Wage Law - Applicability - Elementary and Secondary School Construction Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0092 /CH0343 Planned Apprenticeship Standards and On-the-Job Training Activities - Revisions Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 343
Finance
1/21/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0273 Income Tax Credit - Apprenticeship and Training - Work-Based Learning Program Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0457 (HB0108) Capital Budget - Construction Projects - Apprenticeship Requirements Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Budget and Taxation
SB0545 /CH0403 (HB0290/CH0404) Labor and Employment - Apprenticeship Career Training in Our Neighborhoods (ACTION) Program - Establishment Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403
Finance
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0905 /CH0701 (HB0999/CH0702) Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education Senator King 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 701
Budget and Taxation
3/01/2016 - 8:30 AM
Ways and Means
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0922 (HB1187) Career Apprenticeship Opportunity Act of 2016 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Finance
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
4/11/2016 - 9:00 AM
SB1014 Maryland Clean Energy Jobs Act of 2016 Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; Withdrawn
Rules
SB1126 /CH0470 (HB1615) Frederick County - Linking Youth to New Experiences (LYNX) High School Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM