Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Apprentices

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0465
Title
"EARN" Apprenticeships (Expand Apprenticeship Resources Now Act)
Sponsor
Delegate McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0467 /CH0782 (SB0699)
Title
Providing Our Workers Education and Readiness (POWER) - Apprenticeship Act
Sponsor
Delegate McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0630
Title
Education - On-the-Job Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0652 (SB0335)
Title
Career Apprenticeship Opportunity Act of 2017
Sponsor
Delegate McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0810 /CH0257
Title
Apprenticeships - Apprenticeship and Training Council - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0848 (SB0678)
Title
Community Colleges - Vocational Certificates, Apprenticeship Training Programs, and Associate's Degrees - Tuition Assistance
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1210
Title
Procurement - Prevailing Wage Rates - Applicability to Sheet Metal Fabricators
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1384
Title
Task Force to Study Implementing the German Academic-Apprenticeship Model for Adults Without a High School Education
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1470
Title
Apprenticeship and Training Council - Apprentice Ratios - Electrical Craft or Trade
Sponsor
Delegate McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1512 (SB0942)
Title
Labor and Employment - Clean Energy Workforce Account - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0317 /CH0149 (HB0394)
Title
More Jobs for Marylanders Act of 2017
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0335 (HB0652)
Title
Career Apprenticeship Opportunity Act of 2017
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0678 (HB0848)
Title
Community Colleges - Vocational Certificates, Apprenticeship Training Programs, and Associate's Degrees - Tuition Assistance
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0699 (HB0467/CH0782)
Title
Providing Our Workers Education and Readiness (POWER) - Apprenticeship Act
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0942 (HB1512)
Title
Labor and Employment - Clean Energy Workforce Account - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0465 "EARN" Apprenticeships (Expand Apprenticeship Resources Now Act) Delegate McCray 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0467 /CH0782 (SB0699) Providing Our Workers Education and Readiness (POWER) - Apprenticeship Act Delegate McCray 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 782
Economic Matters
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0630 Education - On-the-Job Pilot Program Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0652 (SB0335) Career Apprenticeship Opportunity Act of 2017 Delegate McCray 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0810 /CH0257 Apprenticeships - Apprenticeship and Training Council - Revisions Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 257
Economic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0848 (SB0678) Community Colleges - Vocational Certificates, Apprenticeship Training Programs, and Associate's Degrees - Tuition Assistance Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1210 Procurement - Prevailing Wage Rates - Applicability to Sheet Metal Fabricators Delegate Frick 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB1384 Task Force to Study Implementing the German Academic-Apprenticeship Model for Adults Without a High School Education Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1470 Apprenticeship and Training Council - Apprentice Ratios - Electrical Craft or Trade Delegate McCray 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1512 (SB0942) Labor and Employment - Clean Energy Workforce Account - Establishment Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/06/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0317 /CH0149 (HB0394) More Jobs for Marylanders Act of 2017 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149
Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0335 (HB0652) Career Apprenticeship Opportunity Act of 2017 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Finance
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Economic Matters
SB0678 (HB0848) Community Colleges - Vocational Certificates, Apprenticeship Training Programs, and Associate's Degrees - Tuition Assistance Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0699 (HB0467/CH0782) Providing Our Workers Education and Readiness (POWER) - Apprenticeship Act Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed
Finance
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Economic Matters
SB0942 (HB1512) Labor and Employment - Clean Energy Workforce Account - Establishment Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM