Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Apprentices

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0431 /CH0379 (SB0308/CH0380)
Title
Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Employment Program (Fostering Employment Act of 2018)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0490 (SB0163/CH0441)
Title
Public Health - Community Health Workers - Advisory Committee and Certification
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0527 /CH0364
Title
Higher Education - Maryland Technology Internship Program - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0976 (SB0261)
Title
Community Colleges – Vocational Certificates, Apprenticeship Training Programs, and Associate Degrees – Tuition Assistance
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1107 /CH0337 (SB0831)
Title
Public Safety – Elevator Inspections – Testing and Apprenticeship Program
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1216 /CH0694 (SB0978/CH0695)
Title
Career Preparation Expansion Act
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1226 (SB0517)
Title
Career Apprenticeship Investment Act
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1234 /CH0403 (SB0618)
Title
Career Youth and Public Sector Apprenticeship Act
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1415 /CH0361 (SB1092)
Title
Education - Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1599 (SB0949)
Title
Career Education Policy Act
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1753 (SB0776)
Title
HBCU Internship in Maryland Government Scholarship Program
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0163 /CH0441 (HB0490)
Title
Public Health – Community Health Workers – Advisory Committee and Certification
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0261 (HB0976)
Title
Community Colleges – Vocational Certificates, Apprenticeship Training Programs, and Associate Degrees – Tuition Assistance
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0308 /CH0380 (HB0431/CH0379)
Title
Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Employment Program (Fostering Employment Act of 2018)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0517 (HB1226)
Title
Career Apprenticeship Investment Act
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0618 (HB1234/CH0403)
Title
Career Youth and Public Sector Apprenticeship Act
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0776 (HB1753)
Title
HBCU Internship in Maryland Government Scholarship Program
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0831 (HB1107/CH0337)
Title
Public Safety – Elevator Inspections – Testing and Apprenticeship Program
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0949 (HB1599)
Title
Career Education Policy Act
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0978 /CH0695 (HB1216/CH0694)
Title
Career Preparation Expansion Act
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0431 /CH0379 (SB0308/CH0380) Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Employment Program (Fostering Employment Act of 2018) Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 379
Appropriations
2/15/2018 - 3:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0490 (SB0163/CH0441) Public Health - Community Health Workers - Advisory Committee and Certification Delegate Lam 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0527 /CH0364 Higher Education - Maryland Technology Internship Program - Alterations Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 364
Appropriations
2/08/2018 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0976 (SB0261) Community Colleges – Vocational Certificates, Apprenticeship Training Programs, and Associate Degrees – Tuition Assistance Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1107 /CH0337 (SB0831) Public Safety – Elevator Inspections – Testing and Apprenticeship Program Delegate Wilson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 337
Economic Matters
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1216 /CH0694 (SB0978/CH0695) Career Preparation Expansion Act Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 694
Economic Matters
3/09/2018 - 2:30 PM
Ways and Means
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Finance
HB1226 (SB0517) Career Apprenticeship Investment Act Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Appropriations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1234 /CH0403 (SB0618) Career Youth and Public Sector Apprenticeship Act Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403
Ways and Means
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Finance
HB1415 /CH0361 (SB1092) Education - Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361
Ways and Means
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
HB1599 (SB0949) Career Education Policy Act Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1753 (SB0776) HBCU Internship in Maryland Government Scholarship Program Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Appropriations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0163 /CH0441 (HB0490) Public Health – Community Health Workers – Advisory Committee and Certification Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 441
Finance
2/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0261 (HB0976) Community Colleges – Vocational Certificates, Apprenticeship Training Programs, and Associate Degrees – Tuition Assistance Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 12:45 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/07/2018 - 12:45 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0308 /CH0380 (HB0431/CH0379) Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Employment Program (Fostering Employment Act of 2018) President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 380
Finance
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 PM
SB0517 (HB1226) Career Apprenticeship Investment Act Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m. (Appropriations)
Finance
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 PM
Economic Matters
SB0618 (HB1234/CH0403) Career Youth and Public Sector Apprenticeship Act Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Ways and Means
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0776 (HB1753) HBCU Internship in Maryland Government Scholarship Program Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0831 (HB1107/CH0337) Public Safety – Elevator Inspections – Testing and Apprenticeship Program Senator Middleton 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0949 (HB1599) Career Education Policy Act Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0978 /CH0695 (HB1216/CH0694) Career Preparation Expansion Act Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 695
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Economic Matters
Ways and Means
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM