Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Calvert County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0472 /CH0233 (SB0416/CH0232)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0930 (SB0640)
Title
Municipalities and Counties - Local Roads - Regulation of Travel by Heavy-Weight Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1423 /CH0310
Title
Calvert County - Board of License Commissioners - Notice and Hearing on Proposed Legislation
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1426
Title
Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1439 (SB0473/CH0080)
Title
Calvert County - Bonding Authority
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1440 /CH0146
Title
Calvert County - Solid Waste Disposal Contracts
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1478
Title
Calvert County - Competitive Bidding Process
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0179
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Calvert County - End Hunger In Calvert County Warehouse
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0352
Title
Calvert County - Calvert County Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund - Uses and Funding Extension
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0416 /CH0232 (HB0472/CH0233)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0473 /CH0080 (HB1439)
Title
Calvert County - Bonding Authority
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0640 (HB0930)
Title
Municipalities and Counties - Local Roads - Regulation of Travel by Heavy-Weight Vehicles
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0800
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Medical Cannabis Grower Licenses - Review of Applications
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0472 /CH0233 (SB0416/CH0232) Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot Program Delegate Jameson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0930 (SB0640) Municipalities and Counties - Local Roads - Regulation of Travel by Heavy-Weight Vehicles Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1423 /CH0310 Calvert County - Board of License Commissioners - Notice and Hearing on Proposed Legislation Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 310
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1426 Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1439 (SB0473/CH0080) Calvert County - Bonding Authority Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Appropriations
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1440 /CH0146 Calvert County - Solid Waste Disposal Contracts Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 146
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1478 Calvert County - Competitive Bidding Process Calvert County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0179 Creation of a State Debt - Calvert County - End Hunger In Calvert County Warehouse Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 9:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 9:00 AM
SB0352 Calvert County - Calvert County Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund - Uses and Funding Extension Calvert County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0416 /CH0232 (HB0472/CH0233) Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot Program Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 232
Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0473 /CH0080 (HB1439) Calvert County - Bonding Authority Calvert County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0640 (HB0930) Municipalities and Counties - Local Roads - Regulation of Travel by Heavy-Weight Vehicles Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0800 Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Medical Cannabis Grower Licenses - Review of Applications Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM