Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 10/21/2020 9:24:10 AM
Wednesday, October 21, 2020
Senate
Created: 10/13/2020 12:46 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM to 3:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Bringing Coherence to the Return of In-Person Instruction in Schools and Recovery for Student Learning Loss Due to Covid-19.

Created: 10/16/2020 7:40 AM
Finance Committee - Work Session
3:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Joint FERC Order Workgroup: Status update on MOPR

House
Created: 10/15/2020 1:49 PM
Economic Matters Committee - Work Session
3:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Meeting Video
Joint FERC Order Workgroup: Status update on MOPR

Other
Board of Public Works
Created: 9/2/2020 2:14 PM
10:00 AM - Governor's Reception Room, 2nd Floor State House, 100 State Circle, Annapolis, MD
The meeting will be conducted via webinar. To view click here
General Meeting

Joint Committee on the Management of Public Funds
Created: 9/4/2020 2:51 PM
1:00 PM - Zoom Meeting
Update from the Comptroller, Treasurer, and Office of Legislative Audits.