Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Calvert County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0053 (SB0131)
Title
County Boards of Education - Length of School Year - Adjustments
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0340
Title
State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations ("Slots" for Homeless Veterans Act)
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0623 /CH0096
Title
Calvert County - Local Debt Bonding Authority
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0833
Title
Motor Vehicles – Town of North Beach – Golf Carts and Robotic Delivery Devices
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0840
Title
Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1219
Title
Calvert County – Soil Percolation Tests – Validity
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1258 /CH0099
Title
Calvert County - Length of Service Award Program - Death Benefits (Patricia Ann "Pat" Osburn Law)
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1358
Title
Natural Resources - Oyster Severance Tax - Increase
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0131 (HB0053)
Title
County Boards of Education - Length of School Year - Adjustments
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0908 /CH0095
Title
Calvert County - State's Attorney - Annual Salary
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0947 /CH0097
Title
Calvert County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0957 /CH0098
Title
Calvert County - Office of the Sheriff - Correctional Deputies
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0973
Title
Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Membership and Funding
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0053 (SB0131) County Boards of Education - Length of School Year - Adjustments Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0340 State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations ("Slots" for Homeless Veterans Act) Delegate McKay 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0623 /CH0096 Calvert County - Local Debt Bonding Authority Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96
Appropriations
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0833 Motor Vehicles – Town of North Beach – Golf Carts and Robotic Delivery Devices Delegate Fisher, M. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0840 Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1219 Calvert County – Soil Percolation Tests – Validity Delegate Fisher, M. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1258 /CH0099 Calvert County - Length of Service Award Program - Death Benefits (Patricia Ann "Pat" Osburn Law) Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99
Appropriations
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1358 Natural Resources - Oyster Severance Tax - Increase Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0131 (HB0053) County Boards of Education - Length of School Year - Adjustments Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0908 /CH0095 Calvert County - State's Attorney - Annual Salary Calvert County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 95
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2019 - 12:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0947 /CH0097 Calvert County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights Calvert County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 97
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0957 /CH0098 Calvert County - Office of the Sheriff - Correctional Deputies Calvert County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 98
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0973 Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Membership and Funding Senator Miller 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:19 PM