Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Examinations

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0136 /CH0106
Title
Insurance - Public Adjusters
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0142 (SB0033)
Title
Financial Institutions - Mortgage Lenders - Examinations and Records
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0191
Title
Optometrists and Physicians - Prescriptions for Lenses - Expiration Dates
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0205
Title
Drivers' Licenses - Learners' Permits - Minimum Duration
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0482 /CH0515 (SB0385/CH0516)
Title
Maryland Nurse Practice Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0513
Title
Education - Participants in Interscholastic Athletic Activities - Concussions - Penalties for Coaches
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0652 (SB0335)
Title
Career Apprenticeship Opportunity Act of 2017
Sponsor
Delegate McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0675 /CH0676 (SB0061/CH0677)
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage for Digital Tomosynthesis
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0834
Title
Education - Maryland High School Diploma - Civics Test Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1053
Title
Integrated Community Oncology Reporting Program
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1277 /CH0505
Title
Insurance - Producer Licensing - Examinations
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1556 (SB0090)
Title
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Classwork and Assessment Involving Live and Dead Animals - Student Right of Refusal
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0033 (HB0142)
Title
Financial Institutions - Mortgage Lenders - Examinations and Records
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0061 /CH0677 (HB0675/CH0676)
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage for Digital Tomosynthesis
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0090 (HB1556)
Title
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Classwork and Assessment Involving Live and Dead Animals - Student Right of Refusal
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0263
Title
Education - Maryland High School Diploma - Civics Test Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0335 (HB0652)
Title
Career Apprenticeship Opportunity Act of 2017
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0385 /CH0516 (HB0482/CH0515)
Title
Maryland Nurse Practice Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0864
Title
Education - Overdose on Public School Premises - Substance Abuse Treatment Programs
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0136 /CH0106 Insurance - Public Adjusters Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106
Economic Matters
1/26/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0142 (SB0033) Financial Institutions - Mortgage Lenders - Examinations and Records Chair, Economic Matters Committee 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0191 Optometrists and Physicians - Prescriptions for Lenses - Expiration Dates Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0205 Drivers' Licenses - Learners' Permits - Minimum Duration Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2017 - 1:15 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0482 /CH0515 (SB0385/CH0516) Maryland Nurse Practice Act - Revisions Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 515
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0513 Education - Participants in Interscholastic Athletic Activities - Concussions - Penalties for Coaches Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0652 (SB0335) Career Apprenticeship Opportunity Act of 2017 Delegate McCray 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0675 /CH0676 (SB0061/CH0677) Health Insurance - Coverage for Digital Tomosynthesis Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 676
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0834 Education - Maryland High School Diploma - Civics Test Requirement Delegate Kittleman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB1053 Integrated Community Oncology Reporting Program Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1277 /CH0505 Insurance - Producer Licensing - Examinations Delegate Davis 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 505
Economic Matters
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1556 (SB0090) Public and Nonpublic Schools - Classwork and Assessment Involving Live and Dead Animals - Student Right of Refusal Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0033 (HB0142) Financial Institutions - Mortgage Lenders - Examinations and Records Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Finance
1/17/2017 - 11:00 AM
Economic Matters
SB0061 /CH0677 (HB0675/CH0676) Health Insurance - Coverage for Digital Tomosynthesis Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 677
Finance
1/25/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0090 (HB1556) Public and Nonpublic Schools - Classwork and Assessment Involving Live and Dead Animals - Student Right of Refusal Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Failed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2017 - 3:00 PM
SB0263 Education - Maryland High School Diploma - Civics Test Requirement Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/01/2017 - 2:00 PM
SB0335 (HB0652) Career Apprenticeship Opportunity Act of 2017 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Finance
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Economic Matters
SB0385 /CH0516 (HB0482/CH0515) Maryland Nurse Practice Act - Revisions Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 516
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0864 Education - Overdose on Public School Premises - Substance Abuse Treatment Programs Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM