Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 3/2/2021 12:26:48 PM
Tuesday, March 2, 2021
Tuesday, March 2, 2021
Senate
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
Change made: March 2, 2021 11:51 AM - HEARING ADDED
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Other
March 4, 2021 4:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Cybersecurity Workgroup

Finance Committee
Change made: March 2, 2021 9:13 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Voting Session
March 3, 2021 4:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0003
Sen Griffith, et al

Preserve Telehealth Access Act of 2021
ADDED: 9:13 AM
SB0035
Sen Feldman

Procurement – Prevailing Wage – Applicability
ADDED: 9:13 AM
SB0051
Sen Bailey

Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Property Management - Southern Maryland Regional Agricultural Center
ADDED: 9:13 AM
SB0080
Sen Kagan

Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Alterations
ADDED: 9:13 AM
SB0107
Sen Hayes

Labor and Employment - Secure Maryland Wage Act
ADDED: 9:13 AM
SB0112
Sen Lee

Commercial Law - Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions
ADDED: 9:13 AM
SB0299
Sen Carter

Human Services - Trauma-Informed Care - Commission and Training
ADDED: 9:13 AM
SB0359
Sen Rosapepe

Department of Transportation and Department of the Environment – Purple Line Tree Replacement Plan
ADDED: 9:13 AM
SB0407
Sen Kramer

Electricity – Net Energy Metering – Limit
ADDED: 9:13 AM
SB0425
Sen Augustine

Workgroup on Screening Related to Adverse Childhood Experiences
ADDED: 9:13 AM
SB0444
Sen West

Transforming Manufacturing in a Digital Economy Workgroup (Making It in Maryland)
ADDED: 9:13 AM
SB0508
Sen Peters

Public Utilities - Net Energy Metering
ADDED: 9:13 AM
SB0520
Sen Klausmeier

Behavioral Health Services and Voluntary Placement Agreements - Children and Young Adults - Report Modifications
ADDED: 9:13 AM
SB0556
Sen Young

Collective Bargaining - Teachers at the Maryland School for the Deaf - Separate Bargaining Unit
ADDED: 9:13 AM
SB0561
Sens Hershey and Eckardt

Electric Cooperatives - Meetings - Alterations
ADDED: 9:13 AM
SB0580
Sen Kagan

Homeowner's Insurance - Weather-Related Claims
ADDED: 9:13 AM
SB0609
Sen Augustine

Economic Development - Maryland Industrial Development Financing Authority - Marketing Plan
ADDED: 9:13 AM
SB0610
Sen Cassilly

Lodging Establishments – Accessible Rooms for Individuals With Disabilities – Deadlines
ADDED: 9:13 AM
SB0638
Sen Augustine

Maryland Insurance Commissioner – Specialty Mental Health Services and Payment of Claims – Enforcement
ADDED: 9:13 AM
SB0652
Sen Klausmeier

Public Health - Long-Term Care Planning
ADDED: 9:13 AM
SB0704
Sen Beidle, et al

Nursing Homes - Transfer of Ownership - Site Visits and Surveys
ADDED: 9:13 AM
SB0707
Sen Feldman

Office of Health Care Quality – Influenza Virus Immunization Education and Information – Assisted Living Facilities
ADDED: 9:13 AM

House
Early Childhood Subcommittee
Change made: March 2, 2021 10:09 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Early Childhood Subcommittee - Voting Session
March 3, 2021 12:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0715
Del Guyton

Public Schools - Self-Contained Special Education Classrooms - Use of Video Recording Devices
REMOVED: 10:09 AM
HB1166
Del Ebersole

Education – Physical Restraint and Seclusion – Requirements, Reporting, and Training
REMOVED: 10:09 AM

Education Subcommittee
Change made: March 2, 2021 9:08 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education Subcommittee - Voting Session
March 3, 2021 12:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB1158
Del M. Fisher

Calvert County - Training on The 1776 Report - Referendum
ADDED: 9:08 AM

Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: March 2, 2021 10:40 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
March 4, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB1041
Del Kelly

Health Occupations Boards - Uniform Reporting
REMOVED: 10:40 AM

Housing and Real Property Subcommittee
Change made: March 2, 2021 9:36 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Housing and Real Property Subcommittee - Work Session
March 3, 2021 12:15 PM
(Previous Date/Time: March 3, 2021 5:00 PM)
Zoom / YouTube
Time of subcommittee meeting will be announced after Bill Hearings are complete.
REMOVED: 9:30 AM
Time of subcommittee meeting will be announced at the end of the floor session.
ADDED: 9:30 AM
REMOVED: 9:36 AM

Motor Vehicle and Transportation Subcommittee
Change made: March 2, 2021 9:33 AM - HEARING ADDED
Motor Vehicle and Transportation Subcommittee - Work Session
March 4, 2021 5:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee
Change made: March 2, 2021 5:49 AM - HEARING ADDED
Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee - Briefing
March 3, 2021 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Maryland Port Administration

Change made: March 2, 2021 5:46 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee - Voting Session
March 4, 2021 9:00 AM
(Previous Date/Time: March 2, 2021 6:00 PM)
Zoom / YouTube

Other
Anne Arundel
Change made: March 2, 2021 9:15 AM - HEARING ADDED
Anne Arundel - Other
March 5, 2021 8:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
County Delegation Meeting

Click to return on the top page