Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Counties - Generally (L1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0432 (SB0316)
Title
Frederick County - Ethics - Former Officials and Employees
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0685 (SB0633/CH0512)
Title
Libraries - County Library Capital Project Grant - Wealth-Based Cost Share
Sponsor
Delegate Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0778 /CH0332 (SB0899/CH0331)
Title
Local Government - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - Distribution
Sponsor
Delegate Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0914
Title
County Income Tax Disparity Grants - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1145 /CH0668
Title
Task Force to Study Energy Generation in Prince George's County PG 416-13
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0316 (HB0432)
Title
Frederick County - Ethics - Former Officials and Employees
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0583
Title
Election Law - Public Campaign Financing of Local Elections
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0633 /CH0512 (HB0685)
Title
Libraries - County Library Capital Project Grant - Wealth-Based Cost Share
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0707
Title
Special Taxing Districts - Transportation Improvements and Exemption from County Tax Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0899 /CH0331 (HB0778/CH0332)
Title
Local Government - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - Distribution
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0940
Title
Baltimore County and Carroll County - Authority to Place Boundary Monuments
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0432 (SB0316) Frederick County - Ethics - Former Officials and Employees Frederick County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB0685 (SB0633/CH0512) Libraries - County Library Capital Project Grant - Wealth-Based Cost Share Delegate Griffith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0778 /CH0332 (SB0899/CH0331) Local Government - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - Distribution Delegate Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 332
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0914 County Income Tax Disparity Grants - Alterations Delegate Serafini 2 2 In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1145 /CH0668 Task Force to Study Energy Generation in Prince George's County PG 416-13 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 668
Economic Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0316 (HB0432) Frederick County - Ethics - Former Officials and Employees Senator Brinkley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0583 Election Law - Public Campaign Financing of Local Elections Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0633 /CH0512 (HB0685) Libraries - County Library Capital Project Grant - Wealth-Based Cost Share Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 512
Budget and Taxation
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0707 Special Taxing Districts - Transportation Improvements and Exemption from County Tax Limitations Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0899 /CH0331 (HB0778/CH0332) Local Government - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - Distribution Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 331
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0940 Baltimore County and Carroll County - Authority to Place Boundary Monuments Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM