Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 10/29/2020 7:51:16 PM
Thursday, October 29, 2020
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
Created: 10/6/2020 4:12 PM
Land Use and Ethics Subcommittee - Work Session
9:30 AM - Virtual Meeting

Other
Juvenile Justice Reform Council
Created: 9/23/2020 7:39 AM
9:00 AM to 11:00 AM - Zoom Meeting
On-Line Council Meeting
The meeting will be open to the public for viewing only (no participation).
A link will be provided to the public in advance of the meeting.
(Removed - 10/26/2020 10:00 AM)

Maryland Community Health Resources Commission
Created: 10/20/2020 1:04 PM
10:00 AM - Conference Call
Dial in Number 1-617-675-4444
Participant Passcode: 730 531 737 7376#
Regular Meeting of the Maryland Community Health Resources Commission.

Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Fund Authority
Created: 10/23/2020 11:26 AM
1:00 PM - Conference Call
Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Fund Authority Meeting to discuss UMCP and UMES.
Conference Call In Number: (US)+1-316-536-0499
PIN: 865 136 975#