Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Counties - Generally (L1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0022
Title
Baltimore City - Prohibition on Ordinance Eliminating or Limiting Duty to Retreat
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0066
Title
Local Government - Dog Licenses - Required
Sponsor
Delegate Tarrant
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0180 /CH0126 (SB0076/CH0125)
Title
Dorchester County Sanitary Commission - Enforcement of Liens - Tax Sale Authorization
Sponsor
Dorchester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0213
Title
Local Government - Permit Review and Explanation of Denial
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0365 /CH0225 (SB0254)
Title
Public Safety - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - Distribution
Sponsor
Delegate Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1261 (SB0397)
Title
Political Subdivisions - Legal Notice Requirements - Posting on Web Sites
Sponsor
Delegate Frank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1279 (SB0627)
Title
Special Taxing Districts - Transportation Improvements and Exemption From County Tax Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1385
Title
Washington County Gaming Commission - Membership - Conflict of Interest
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1473 (SB1010)
Title
Domestic Animals - Sterilization and Life-Sustaining Care of Cats - Determination of Dangerousness
Sponsor
Delegate Kach
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0076 /CH0125 (HB0180/CH0126)
Title
Dorchester County Sanitary Commission - Enforcement of Liens - Tax Sale Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0254 (HB0365/CH0225)
Title
Public Safety - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - Distribution
Sponsor
Senator Glassman
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0397 (HB1261)
Title
Political Subdivisions - Legal Notice Requirements - Posting on Web Sites
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0465 /CH0171
Title
Washington County Gaming Commission - Membership - Conflict of Interest
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0627 (HB1279)
Title
Special Taxing Districts - Transportation Improvements and Exemption From County Tax Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0781 /CH0338
Title
Environment - Recycling - Special Events
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0905
Title
Community-Based Developmental Disabilities and Mental Health Services Providers - County Minimum Wage Reimbursement
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1010 (HB1473)
Title
Domestic Animals - Sterilization and Life-Sustaining Care of Cats - Determination of Dangerousness
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0022 Baltimore City - Prohibition on Ordinance Eliminating or Limiting Duty to Retreat Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0066 Local Government - Dog Licenses - Required Delegate Tarrant 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0180 /CH0126 (SB0076/CH0125) Dorchester County Sanitary Commission - Enforcement of Liens - Tax Sale Authorization Dorchester County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 126
Environmental Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0213 Local Government - Permit Review and Explanation of Denial Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0365 /CH0225 (SB0254) Public Safety - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - Distribution Delegate Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 225
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 PM
HB1261 (SB0397) Political Subdivisions - Legal Notice Requirements - Posting on Web Sites Delegate Frank 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB1279 (SB0627) Special Taxing Districts - Transportation Improvements and Exemption From County Tax Limitations Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1385 Washington County Gaming Commission - Membership - Conflict of Interest Washington County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Ways and Means
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1473 (SB1010) Domestic Animals - Sterilization and Life-Sustaining Care of Cats - Determination of Dangerousness Delegate Kach 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0076 /CH0125 (HB0180/CH0126) Dorchester County Sanitary Commission - Enforcement of Liens - Tax Sale Authorization Senator Colburn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125
Budget and Taxation
1/22/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0254 (HB0365/CH0225) Public Safety - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - Distribution Senator Glassman 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0397 (HB1261) Political Subdivisions - Legal Notice Requirements - Posting on Web Sites Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0465 /CH0171 Washington County Gaming Commission - Membership - Conflict of Interest Senator Shank 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 171
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0627 (HB1279) Special Taxing Districts - Transportation Improvements and Exemption From County Tax Limitations Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:30 PM
SB0781 /CH0338 Environment - Recycling - Special Events Senator Montgomery 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 338
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0905 Community-Based Developmental Disabilities and Mental Health Services Providers - County Minimum Wage Reimbursement Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1010 (HB1473) Domestic Animals - Sterilization and Life-Sustaining Care of Cats - Determination of Dangerousness Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM