Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Counties - Generally (L1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0106 /CH0067
Title
Montgomery County - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Adoption of Local Ordinance MC 11-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0187 /CH0228 (SB0021)
Title
Cecil County and Queen Anne's County - Intergovernmental Cooperation and Acceptance of Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0354 /CH0242
Title
Calvert County - Task Force to Study the Commemoration of Harriet Elizabeth Brown
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0440 /CH0248
Title
Howard County - Insurance - Certificates of Guarantee for County Bond Requirements Ho. Co. 8-15
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0604 (SB0166)
Title
General Assembly - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1264
Title
Building Performance Standards - Fire Sprinkler System Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1273 (SB0928/CH0212)
Title
Somerset County Sanitary Commission - Enforcement of Liens - Tax Sale Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0021 (HB0187/CH0228)
Title
Cecil County and Queen Anne's County - Intergovernmental Cooperation and Acceptance of Funds
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0166 (HB0604)
Title
General Assembly - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0265 /CH0334
Title
Calvert County - Electronic Bingo and Electronic Tip Jars - Distribution of Admissions and Amusement Tax Revenues
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0928 /CH0212 (HB1273)
Title
Somerset County Sanitary Commission - Enforcement of Liens - Tax Sale Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0106 /CH0067 Montgomery County - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Adoption of Local Ordinance MC 11-15 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 67
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0187 /CH0228 (SB0021) Cecil County and Queen Anne's County - Intergovernmental Cooperation and Acceptance of Funds Delegate Arentz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0354 /CH0242 Calvert County - Task Force to Study the Commemoration of Harriet Elizabeth Brown Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 242
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0440 /CH0248 Howard County - Insurance - Certificates of Guarantee for County Bond Requirements Ho. Co. 8-15 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 248
Appropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0604 (SB0166) General Assembly - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1264 Building Performance Standards - Fire Sprinkler System Exemptions Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1273 (SB0928/CH0212) Somerset County Sanitary Commission - Enforcement of Liens - Tax Sale Authorization Delegate Otto 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0021 (HB0187/CH0228) Cecil County and Queen Anne's County - Intergovernmental Cooperation and Acceptance of Funds Senator Hershey 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0166 (HB0604) General Assembly - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0265 /CH0334 Calvert County - Electronic Bingo and Electronic Tip Jars - Distribution of Admissions and Amusement Tax Revenues Calvert County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0928 /CH0212 (HB1273) Somerset County Sanitary Commission - Enforcement of Liens - Tax Sale Authorization Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2015 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM