Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Counties - Generally (L1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0277
Title
Municipalities - Authority to Serve Citations for Violations of County Laws
Sponsor
Delegate Tarlau
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0442 (SB0303)
Title
Counties - Transportation Adequate Public Facility Law - State Highway Intersection
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0577 (SB0431/CH0206)
Title
Allegany County and Garrett County - Annual Financial Reports - Filing Date
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0598
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Distribution and Sales Tax Revenues
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0736
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Rights for Local Government Employees - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Tarlau
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0851
Title
Counties - Paid Sick Leave for Limited-Term Grant-Funded Employees - Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1025
Title
Prince George's County - Land Use - Zoning Powers and Review PG/MC 111-16
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1027
Title
Prince George's County - Land Use Permit Review - Consolidation PG/MC 110-16
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1121 (SB0012)
Title
Health Care Facilities - Closures or Partial Closures of Hospitals - County Board of Health Approval
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0012 (HB1121)
Title
Health Care Facilities - Closures or Partial Closures of Hospitals - County Board of Health Approval
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0303 (HB0442)
Title
Counties - Transportation Adequate Public Facility Law - State Highway Intersection
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0431 /CH0206 (HB0577)
Title
Allegany County and Garrett County - Annual Financial Reports - Filing Date
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1134
Title
Criminal Procedure - Initial Appearance Before a District Court Commissioner - Costs for Appointed Legal Representation
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0277 Municipalities - Authority to Serve Citations for Violations of County Laws Delegate Tarlau 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0442 (SB0303) Counties - Transportation Adequate Public Facility Law - State Highway Intersection Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0577 (SB0431/CH0206) Allegany County and Garrett County - Annual Financial Reports - Filing Date Allegany County Delegation 4 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0598 Alcoholic Beverages - Distribution and Sales Tax Revenues Delegate Frick 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0736 Labor and Employment - Employment Rights for Local Government Employees - Establishment Delegate Tarlau 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0851 Counties - Paid Sick Leave for Limited-Term Grant-Funded Employees - Requirement Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1025 Prince George's County - Land Use - Zoning Powers and Review PG/MC 111-16 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB1027 Prince George's County - Land Use Permit Review - Consolidation PG/MC 110-16 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB1121 (SB0012) Health Care Facilities - Closures or Partial Closures of Hospitals - County Board of Health Approval Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0012 (HB1121) Health Care Facilities - Closures or Partial Closures of Hospitals - County Board of Health Approval Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0303 (HB0442) Counties - Transportation Adequate Public Facility Law - State Highway Intersection Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Finance
SB0431 /CH0206 (HB0577) Allegany County and Garrett County - Annual Financial Reports - Filing Date Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 206
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB1134 Criminal Procedure - Initial Appearance Before a District Court Commissioner - Costs for Appointed Legal Representation Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM