Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Counties - Generally (L1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0334 /CH0414 (SB0573/CH0415)
Title
Local Government - Regulation of Animals - Kennel Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0357
Title
Expungement - Fee - Baltimore City Consent Decree
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0583 (SB0421)
Title
Counties - Historic Preservation - Development Limitation
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0708 /CH0551
Title
State Department of Education - Lacrosse Opportunities Program - Youth Lacrosse Nonprofit Organizations
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0852 /CH0483
Title
Courts - Action for Violation of Collective Bargaining Agreement or Breach of Duty of Fair Representation - Limitations Period
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0854
Title
Units of State Government - Award of Grants to Counties - Requirement of Paid Sick Leave
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0947
Title
Vehicle Laws - Vehicle Presence Monitoring Systems - Authorization by Local Jurisdictions
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1168 /CH0618 (SB0957/CH0619)
Title
Counties and Municipalities - Land Bank Authorities
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1300 /CH0419
Title
Charles County - Garbage Disposal Services - Provider Displacement
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1320 /CH0735
Title
Southern Maryland Code Counties - Towing Companies - Authority to Regulate
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1370
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Rights for Local Government Employees - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0214
Title
Local Government - Public Nuisances - Restriction on Local "Padlock" Laws
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0352
Title
Calvert County - Calvert County Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund - Uses and Funding Extension
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0421 (HB0583)
Title
Counties - Historic Preservation - Development Limitation
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0573 /CH0415 (HB0334/CH0414)
Title
Local Government - Regulation of Animals - Kennel Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0957 /CH0619 (HB1168/CH0618)
Title
Counties and Municipalities - Land Bank Authorities
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1027 /CH0482
Title
Courts - Action for Violation of Collective Bargaining Agreement or Breach of Duty of Fair Representation - Limitations Period
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0334 /CH0414 (SB0573/CH0415) Local Government - Regulation of Animals - Kennel Licenses Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 414
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0357 Expungement - Fee - Baltimore City Consent Decree Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0583 (SB0421) Counties - Historic Preservation - Development Limitation Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Environment and Transportation
HB0708 /CH0551 State Department of Education - Lacrosse Opportunities Program - Youth Lacrosse Nonprofit Organizations Delegate Walker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 551
Ways and Means
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0852 /CH0483 Courts - Action for Violation of Collective Bargaining Agreement or Breach of Duty of Fair Representation - Limitations Period Delegate Barkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 483
Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0854 Units of State Government - Award of Grants to Counties - Requirement of Paid Sick Leave Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0947 Vehicle Laws - Vehicle Presence Monitoring Systems - Authorization by Local Jurisdictions Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1168 /CH0618 (SB0957/CH0619) Counties and Municipalities - Land Bank Authorities Delegate Holmes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 618
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1300 /CH0419 Charles County - Garbage Disposal Services - Provider Displacement Charles County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419
Environment and Transportation
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1320 /CH0735 Southern Maryland Code Counties - Towing Companies - Authority to Regulate Charles County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 735
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1370 Labor and Employment - Employment Rights for Local Government Employees - Establishment Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0214 Local Government - Public Nuisances - Restriction on Local "Padlock" Laws Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0352 Calvert County - Calvert County Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund - Uses and Funding Extension Calvert County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0421 (HB0583) Counties - Historic Preservation - Development Limitation Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0573 /CH0415 (HB0334/CH0414) Local Government - Regulation of Animals - Kennel Licenses Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0957 /CH0619 (HB1168/CH0618) Counties and Municipalities - Land Bank Authorities Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 619
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
SB1027 /CH0482 Courts - Action for Violation of Collective Bargaining Agreement or Breach of Duty of Fair Representation - Limitations Period Senator Manno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 482
Finance
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM