Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Counties - Generally (L1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0233
Title
Task Force to Study Health and Safety Standards for Rental Housing in Prince George's County PG 410-18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0637 (SB1004)
Title
Counties - Asset Transfer for High-Speed Transportation System - Hearing and Approval Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0638 (SB1005)
Title
Counties and Municipalities - Asset Transfer for High-Speed Transportation System - Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0686 /CH0824 (SB0742/CH0028)
Title
Income Tax - Wynne Case - Local Government Repayments to the Local Reserve Account
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1079
Title
Frederick County and Prince George’s County – Building and Housing Codes – Materials Used to Board or Secure Residential Property
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1246 (SB0954)
Title
Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned Property
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1458
Title
District Court – County Zoning Violation – Appeals
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1459 /CH0118
Title
Calvert County – Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund and Distribution From Admissions and Amusement Tax Revenues
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0742 /CH0028 (HB0686/CH0824)
Title
Income Tax - Wynne Case - Local Government Repayments to the Local Reserve Account
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0954 (HB1246)
Title
Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned Property
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1003
Title
Magnetic Levitation Transportation System - Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1004 (HB0637)
Title
Counties - Asset Transfer for High-Speed Transportation System - Hearing and Approval Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1005 (HB0638)
Title
Counties and Municipalities - Asset Transfer for High-Speed Transportation System - Agreements
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0233 Task Force to Study Health and Safety Standards for Rental Housing in Prince George's County PG 410-18 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0637 (SB1004) Counties - Asset Transfer for High-Speed Transportation System - Hearing and Approval Requirements Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0638 (SB1005) Counties and Municipalities - Asset Transfer for High-Speed Transportation System - Agreements Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0686 /CH0824 (SB0742/CH0028) Income Tax - Wynne Case - Local Government Repayments to the Local Reserve Account Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 824
Ways and Means
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1079 Frederick County and Prince George’s County – Building and Housing Codes – Materials Used to Board or Secure Residential Property Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB1246 (SB0954) Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned Property Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1458 District Court – County Zoning Violation – Appeals Calvert County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1459 /CH0118 Calvert County – Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund and Distribution From Admissions and Amusement Tax Revenues Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 118
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0742 /CH0028 (HB0686/CH0824) Income Tax - Wynne Case - Local Government Repayments to the Local Reserve Account Senator Madaleno 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 28
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0954 (HB1246) Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned Property Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2018 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1003 Magnetic Levitation Transportation System - Limitations Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB1004 (HB0637) Counties - Asset Transfer for High-Speed Transportation System - Hearing and Approval Requirements Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1005 (HB0638) Counties and Municipalities - Asset Transfer for High-Speed Transportation System - Agreements Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM