Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Counties - Generally (L1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0302 /CH0561
Title
Montgomery County Housing Opportunities Commission - Collective Bargaining - Exclusive Representative Duty of Fair Representation MC 26-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0557 (SB0509/CH0276)
Title
Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned Property
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0627 (SB0610)
Title
Solar Photovoltaic Property - Personal Property Tax Exemption and Local Fee Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0880
Title
Counties and Municipalities - Transportation of Animals - Limitation on Authority
Sponsor
Delegate Arikan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1034
Title
Education - Interagency Commission on School Construction - Reimbursement to Eligible Counties
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1165 (SB0718)
Title
State Government – Government Agents – Requests for and Use of Immigration Status Information
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1419 (SB0563)
Title
Zoning - Special Exceptions - Construction or Operation of Landfills
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0509 /CH0276 (HB0557)
Title
Property Tax – In Rem Foreclosure and Sale – Vacant and Abandoned Property
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0563 (HB1419)
Title
Zoning - Special Exceptions - Construction or Operation of Landfills
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0610 (HB0627)
Title
Solar Photovoltaic Property - Personal Property Tax Exemption and Local Fee Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0644
Title
Circuit Court Fines, Penalties, and Forfeitures - Funding - Drug Treatment and Education
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0718 (HB1165)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Government Agents - Requests for and Use of Immigration Status Information
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0740
Title
Counties – Innovative Development Competitions
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0851
Title
Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses, Mandatory Appropriation, and County Authority to Incur Indebtedness
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0973
Title
Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Membership and Funding
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0302 /CH0561 Montgomery County Housing Opportunities Commission - Collective Bargaining - Exclusive Representative Duty of Fair Representation MC 26-19 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 561
Appropriations
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0557 (SB0509/CH0276) Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned Property Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0627 (SB0610) Solar Photovoltaic Property - Personal Property Tax Exemption and Local Fee Requirement Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0880 Counties and Municipalities - Transportation of Animals - Limitation on Authority Delegate Arikan 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1034 Education - Interagency Commission on School Construction - Reimbursement to Eligible Counties Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB1165 (SB0718) State Government – Government Agents – Requests for and Use of Immigration Status Information Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1419 (SB0563) Zoning - Special Exceptions - Construction or Operation of Landfills Delegate Turner 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0509 /CH0276 (HB0557) Property Tax – In Rem Foreclosure and Sale – Vacant and Abandoned Property Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 276
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0563 (HB1419) Zoning - Special Exceptions - Construction or Operation of Landfills Senator Patterson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0610 (HB0627) Solar Photovoltaic Property - Personal Property Tax Exemption and Local Fee Requirement Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
SB0644 Circuit Court Fines, Penalties, and Forfeitures - Funding - Drug Treatment and Education Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 9:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2019 - 9:00 AM
SB0718 (HB1165) Criminal Procedure - Government Agents - Requests for and Use of Immigration Status Information Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0740 Counties – Innovative Development Competitions Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0851 Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses, Mandatory Appropriation, and County Authority to Incur Indebtedness Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0973 Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Membership and Funding Senator Miller 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:15 PM