Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Counties - Generally (L1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0057
Title
Animal Shelters - Standards of Operation
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0384 (SB0429)
Title
Charles County - Illegal Disposal of Bulky Items - Penalties
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0387 (SB0805)
Title
Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Funding
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0621
Title
County Tax Fairness Act
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0791
Title
Montgomery County - Housing Opportunities Commission - Procurement MC 5-20
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0807
Title
Montgomery County - Housing Opportunities Commission - Selection of Chair MC 1-20
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0818
Title
Redistricting and Apportionment - Population Count - Citizenship Status
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0821
Title
Montgomery County Stable Homes Act MC 12-20
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0853
Title
Local Government - Clean Energy Loan Programs - Grid Resilience Projects
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1028
Title
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Electric Retractable Room Partitions - Model Safety Guidelines and Local Law
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1147 (SB0401)
Title
Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Single-Occupancy Public Restrooms - Availability (The Accessible to All Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1155
Title
Local Governments - Responsibility for Repairing or Replacing Sidewalks
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1199
Title
Real Property - County Rental Property Licenses - Requirements and Limits
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1276
Title
County Property Tax - Classifications of Real Property and Authority to Set Special Rates
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1500
Title
Special Taxing Districts - Eastern Shore Code Counties - Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0065
Title
Counties - Construction of Sidewalks and Crosswalks - Safe Alternative Routes to Public Schools
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0118
Title
Land Use - Alcohol Production and Agricultural Alcohol Production
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0401 (HB1147)
Title
Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Single-Occupancy Public Restrooms - Availability (The Accessible to All Act)
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0429 (HB0384)
Title
Charles County - Illegal Disposal of Bulky Items - Penalties
Sponsor
Charles County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0491
Title
Regulation of Invasive Plants - Bamboo - Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0671
Title
Bay Restoration Fund - Allocation of Fees, Authorized Uses, and County Authority to Incur Indebtedness
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0805 (HB0387)
Title
Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Funding
Sponsor
Charles County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0057 Animal Shelters - Standards of Operation Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0384 (SB0429) Charles County - Illegal Disposal of Bulky Items - Penalties Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0387 (SB0805) Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Funding Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0621 County Tax Fairness Act Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0791 Montgomery County - Housing Opportunities Commission - Procurement MC 5-20 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0807 Montgomery County - Housing Opportunities Commission - Selection of Chair MC 1-20 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0818 Redistricting and Apportionment - Population Count - Citizenship Status Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB0821 Montgomery County Stable Homes Act MC 12-20 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0853 Local Government - Clean Energy Loan Programs - Grid Resilience Projects Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1028 Public and Nonpublic Schools - Electric Retractable Room Partitions - Model Safety Guidelines and Local Law Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Ways and Means
HB1147 (SB0401) Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Single-Occupancy Public Restrooms - Availability (The Accessible to All Act) Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB1155 Local Governments - Responsibility for Repairing or Replacing Sidewalks Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1199 Real Property - County Rental Property Licenses - Requirements and Limits Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1276 County Property Tax - Classifications of Real Property and Authority to Set Special Rates Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1500 Special Taxing Districts - Eastern Shore Code Counties - Authorization Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0065 Counties - Construction of Sidewalks and Crosswalks - Safe Alternative Routes to Public Schools Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0118 Land Use - Alcohol Production and Agricultural Alcohol Production Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2020 - 2:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0401 (HB1147) Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Single-Occupancy Public Restrooms - Availability (The Accessible to All Act) Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2020 - 12:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0429 (HB0384) Charles County - Illegal Disposal of Bulky Items - Penalties Charles County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0491 Regulation of Invasive Plants - Bamboo - Prohibitions Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0671 Bay Restoration Fund - Allocation of Fees, Authorized Uses, and County Authority to Incur Indebtedness Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0805 (HB0387) Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Funding Charles County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2020 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 2/14/2020 2:00 PM