Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Counties - Generally (L1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0051 (SB0121)
Title
Zoning - Environmental Justice Considerations
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0524
Title
Anne Arundel County and Prince George’s County – Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent – Rental Property License Information
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0574
Title
Montgomery County Stable Homes Act MC 8–21
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0635
Title
Maryland Emergency Management Agency, Department of Transportation, and Department of the Environment – Study on Historic and Recent Flooding in Prince George’s County PG 407–21
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0704
Title
Land Use – Magnetic Levitation Transportation System Siting (Maryland Stop the Maglev Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0921
Title
Baltimore County – Sewer Service Charge – Adjustment
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1081 (SB0751)
Title
Southern Maryland – Human Relations Commission
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1093
Title
Real Property - Emergency Services and Nuisance Actions
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1194 (SB0544)
Title
Charter and Code Home Rule Counties – County Property Leases – Notice Exemptions
Sponsor
Dorchester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1285
Title
Howard County - Fee for Rental Housing Services - Established Ho. Co. 15-21
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0054
Title
Local Government – Clean Energy Loan Programs – Grid Resilience Projects
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0121 (HB0051)
Title
Zoning - Environmental Justice Considerations
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0544 (HB1194)
Title
Charter and Code Home Rule Counties - County Property Leases - Notice Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0751 (HB1081)
Title
Southern Maryland - Human Relations Commission
Sponsor
Charles County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0051 (SB0121) Zoning - Environmental Justice Considerations Delegate Turner 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0524 Anne Arundel County and Prince George’s County – Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent – Rental Property License Information Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0574 Montgomery County Stable Homes Act MC 8–21 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0635 Maryland Emergency Management Agency, Department of Transportation, and Department of the Environment – Study on Historic and Recent Flooding in Prince George’s County PG 407–21 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0704 Land Use – Magnetic Levitation Transportation System Siting (Maryland Stop the Maglev Act of 2021) Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0921 Baltimore County – Sewer Service Charge – Adjustment Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB1081 (SB0751) Southern Maryland – Human Relations Commission Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1093 Real Property - Emergency Services and Nuisance Actions Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1194 (SB0544) Charter and Code Home Rule Counties – County Property Leases – Notice Exemptions Dorchester County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1285 Howard County - Fee for Rental Housing Services - Established Ho. Co. 15-21 Howard County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
3/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0054 Local Government – Clean Energy Loan Programs – Grid Resilience Projects Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Kelley)
Finance
SB0121 (HB0051) Zoning - Environmental Justice Considerations Senator Patterson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0544 (HB1194) Charter and Code Home Rule Counties - County Property Leases - Notice Exemptions Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:15 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2021 - 1:15 PM
SB0751 (HB1081) Southern Maryland - Human Relations Commission Charles County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:15 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2021 - 1:15 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 5:20 PM
Click to return on the top page