Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Natural Resources -see also- Conserv; Forest & Park; Wildlds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0096 /CH0080
Title
Natural Resources - Restricted Shellfish Harvest Areas - Water Testing
Sponsor
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0215 (SB0208)
Title
Natural Resources Police Force - Number of Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Cane
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0337 (SB0514)
Title
Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0706 /CH0384
Title
Natural Resources - Forest Preservation Act of 2013
Sponsor
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0936 /CH0655
Title
Natural Resources - Maryland Botanical Heritage Workgroup
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1241 (SB0525)
Title
Fishing - Sustainable Fisheries Enforcement Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1426 (SB0908)
Title
Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Reemployment of Retirees
Sponsor
Delegate DeBoy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0208 (HB0215)
Title
Natural Resources Police Force - Number of Officers
Sponsor
Senator Dyson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0514 (HB0337)
Title
Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0525 (HB1241)
Title
Fishing - Sustainable Fisheries Enforcement Fund
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0601
Title
Maryland Hydraulic Fracturing Moratorium and Right to Know Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0879
Title
Natural Gas Severance Tax and Impact Account
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0908 (HB1426)
Title
Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Reemployment of Retirees
Sponsor
Senator Robey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0096 /CH0080 Natural Resources - Restricted Shellfish Harvest Areas - Water Testing Chair, Environmental Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80
Environmental Matters
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0215 (SB0208) Natural Resources Police Force - Number of Officers Delegate Cane 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Environmental Matters
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
HB0337 (SB0514) Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - Prohibition Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB0706 /CH0384 Natural Resources - Forest Preservation Act of 2013 Chair, Environmental Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 384
Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0936 /CH0655 Natural Resources - Maryland Botanical Heritage Workgroup Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 655
Environmental Matters
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1241 (SB0525) Fishing - Sustainable Fisheries Enforcement Fund Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1426 (SB0908) Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Reemployment of Retirees Delegate DeBoy 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0208 (HB0215) Natural Resources Police Force - Number of Officers Senator Dyson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0514 (HB0337) Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - Prohibition Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0525 (HB1241) Fishing - Sustainable Fisheries Enforcement Fund Senator Colburn 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0601 Maryland Hydraulic Fracturing Moratorium and Right to Know Act of 2013 Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0879 Natural Gas Severance Tax and Impact Account Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0908 (HB1426) Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Reemployment of Retirees Senator Robey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/07/2013 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM