Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 8/13/2020 12:06:23 AM
Thursday, August 13, 2020
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
Created: 7/29/2020 1:02 PM
Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee - Briefing
2:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Meeting Video
Using Telework as a Tool to Mitigate Traffic Congestion and Pollution

Other
Law Enforcement Body Camera Task Force
Created: 8/12/2020 3:37 PM
1:00 PM - On-Line Meeting
To view the meeting click here

School Construction, Interagency Commission on
Created: 7/13/2020 3:28 PM
9:00 AM to 1:00 PM - On-Line Meeting
To view the meeting click on livestream , and click on "Youtube Live Stream", under the appropriate date. Additional meeting information will be available at iac.maryland.gov
Public teleconference to discuss normal IAC business.