Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Natural Resources -see also- Conserv; Forest & Park; Wildlds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0002 (SB0615)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0449 /CH0481 (SB0409/CH0480)
Title
Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing - Regulations
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0713
Title
Natural Resources - Trade in Ivory and Rhinoceros Horn - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0914 (SB0322)
Title
Natural Resources - Nuisance Organisms - Reward for Information
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1091 (SB0134)
Title
Open Space Incentive Program - Payments to Counties
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1281
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Maryland Search and Rescue Wilderness EMS
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0029
Title
Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing - Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0057 (HB0072/CH0489)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0322 (HB0914)
Title
Natural Resources - Nuisance Organisms - Reward for Information
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0409 /CH0480 (HB0449/CH0481)
Title
Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing - Regulations
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0615 (HB0002)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0712
Title
Natural Gas Severance Tax and Impact Account
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0002 (SB0615) Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 Speaker 3 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489
Appropriations
3/03/2015 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0449 /CH0481 (SB0409/CH0480) Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing - Regulations Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 481
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0713 Natural Resources - Trade in Ivory and Rhinoceros Horn - Prohibition Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/04/2015 - 1:15 PM
HB0914 (SB0322) Natural Resources - Nuisance Organisms - Reward for Information Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1091 (SB0134) Open Space Incentive Program - Payments to Counties Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1281 Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Maryland Search and Rescue Wilderness EMS Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2015 - 10:00 AM
SB0029 Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing - Prohibitions Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0057 (HB0072/CH0489) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0322 (HB0914) Natural Resources - Nuisance Organisms - Reward for Information Senator Middleton 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0409 /CH0480 (HB0449/CH0481) Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing - Regulations Senator Montgomery 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 480
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0615 (HB0002) Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0712 Natural Gas Severance Tax and Impact Account Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM