Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Natural Resources -see also- Conserv; Forest & Park; Wildlds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0126 /CH0102
Title
Natural Resources - Wildlife and Hunting
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0924 /CH0027
Title
Natural Resources - Oyster Management - Prohibited Actions
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0960 (SB1002)
Title
State Designations - State Mineral - Chromite
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0181
Title
Task Force to Study Data Sharing Among the Maryland Judiciary, the Maryland Parole Commission, and the Department of Natural Resources
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1002 (HB0960)
Title
State Designations - State Mineral - Chromite
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0008 /JR0004 (HJ0010)
Title
Chesapeake Bay Restoration - Federal Budget Blueprint Funding Reductions - Rescission Request
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0126 /CH0102 Natural Resources - Wildlife and Hunting Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 102
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0924 /CH0027 Natural Resources - Oyster Management - Prohibited Actions Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 27
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0960 (SB1002) State Designations - State Mineral - Chromite Delegate Frick 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0181 Task Force to Study Data Sharing Among the Maryland Judiciary, the Maryland Parole Commission, and the Department of Natural Resources Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1002 (HB0960) State Designations - State Mineral - Chromite Senator Zucker 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
SJ0008 /JR0004 (HJ0010) Chesapeake Bay Restoration - Federal Budget Blueprint Funding Reductions - Rescission Request Senator Pinsky 2 2 Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 4
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
4/08/2017 - 10:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:46 PM