Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Open Government

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0169 (SB0091)
Title
State Board of Elections - Open Meetings - Audio Recordings and Documents (State Board of Elections Transparency Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0438 (SB0253)
Title
Legislative Transparency Act of 2017
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0880 /CH0525 (SB0450/CH0526)
Title
Open Meetings Act - Annual Reporting Requirement, Web Site Postings, and Training
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0909 (SB0571/CH0017)
Title
Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0933
Title
General Assembly - Live and Archived Video Streaming of Meetings
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1134 /CH0781 (SB0884/CH0018)
Title
Maryland Financial Consumer Protection Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1541 (SB0910/CH0509)
Title
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Operations
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0091 (HB0169)
Title
State Board of Elections - Open Meetings - Video Streaming and Recording (State Board of Elections Transparency Act)
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0253 (HB0438)
Title
Legislative Transparency Act of 2017
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0450 /CH0526 (HB0880/CH0525)
Title
Open Meetings Act - Annual Reporting Requirement, Web Site Postings, and Training
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0571 /CH0017 (HB0909)
Title
Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0884 /CH0018 (HB1134/CH0781)
Title
Maryland Financial Consumer Protection Commission
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0910 /CH0509 (HB1541)
Title
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Operations
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0169 (SB0091) State Board of Elections - Open Meetings - Audio Recordings and Documents (State Board of Elections Transparency Act) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0438 (SB0253) Legislative Transparency Act of 2017 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB0880 /CH0525 (SB0450/CH0526) Open Meetings Act - Annual Reporting Requirement, Web Site Postings, and Training Delegate Morales 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 525
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0909 (SB0571/CH0017) Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Act Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Finance
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0933 General Assembly - Live and Archived Video Streaming of Meetings Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1134 /CH0781 (SB0884/CH0018) Maryland Financial Consumer Protection Commission Delegate Frick 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 781
Economic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1541 (SB0910/CH0509) Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Operations Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Economic Matters
SB0091 (HB0169) State Board of Elections - Open Meetings - Video Streaming and Recording (State Board of Elections Transparency Act) Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 2:15 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2017 - 2:15 PM
SB0253 (HB0438) Legislative Transparency Act of 2017 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0450 /CH0526 (HB0880/CH0525) Open Meetings Act - Annual Reporting Requirement, Web Site Postings, and Training Senator Manno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 526
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0571 /CH0017 (HB0909) Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Act Senator Middleton 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 17
Finance
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0884 /CH0018 (HB1134/CH0781) Maryland Financial Consumer Protection Commission Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 18
Finance
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0910 /CH0509 (HB1541) Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Operations Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 509
Finance
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:47 PM