Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 1/25/2021 11:34:33 AM
Monday, January 25, 2021
Monday, January 25, 2021
Senate
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
Change made: January 25, 2021 11:26 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Bill Hearing
January 27, 2021 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0127
Sens Patterson and Augustine

Institutions of Higher Education - Use of Criminal History in Admission - Modifications
REMOVED: 11:26 AM

Judicial Proceedings Committee
Change made: January 25, 2021 8:29 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
January 28, 2021 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0419
Sen Carter

No-Knock Warrants - Elimination
ADDED: 8:29 AM
SB0482
Sen Carter

Public Safety - Law Enforcement Officers - Whistleblower Protections
ADDED: 8:29 AM

Change made: January 25, 2021 8:45 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
February 3, 2021 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0498
Sen Kelley

Correctional Services - Parole - Life Imprisonment
ADDED: 8:29 AM
REMOVED: 8:45 AM

Change made: January 25, 2021 8:29 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
February 9, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0454
Sen Sydnor

Real Property – Alterations in Actions for Repossession and Establishment of Eviction Diversion Program
ADDED: 8:29 AM
SB0455
Sen Sydnor

Employment Discrimination - Time for Filing Complaints
ADDED: 8:29 AM
SB0474
Sen Eckardt

Real Property - Sale of Mobile Home Parks - Notice Requirements
ADDED: 8:29 AM
SB0488
Sen Beidle

Family Law - Marriage - Licenses and Records
ADDED: 8:29 AM
SB0504
Sen Smith

Discrimination in Employment – Use of Medical Cannabis – Prohibition
ADDED: 8:29 AM

Change made: January 25, 2021 8:29 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
February 10, 2021 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0434
Sen King

Vehicle Laws – Failure to Pay Video Toll – Outstanding Fines
ADDED: 8:29 AM
SB0435
Sen King

Vehicle Laws - Failure to Pay Video Toll - Penalties
ADDED: 8:29 AM
SB0445
Sen West

Vehicle Equipment - Safety Glass - Replacement Standards
ADDED: 8:29 AM
SB0467
Sen West

Estates and Trusts - Administration of Estates - Payment of Commissions and Attorney's Fees
ADDED: 8:29 AM
SB0478
Sen Smith

Correctional Services – Immigration Detention – Prohibition (Dignity Not Detention Act)
ADDED: 8:29 AM
SB0484
Sen Hettleman

Criminal Procedure - Victims of Crime - Private Room
ADDED: 8:29 AM

Change made: January 25, 2021 8:29 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
February 11, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0420
Sen Carter

Criminal Law – Drug Paraphernalia for Administration – Decriminalization
ADDED: 8:29 AM
SB0440
Sen Lee

Courts - Wiretapping - Misconduct in Office
ADDED: 8:29 AM
SB0443
Sen West

Crimes - Malicious Destruction of Historically Significant Monument (Monument Protection Act of 2021)
ADDED: 8:29 AM
SB0456
Sen Sydnor

Office of the State's Attorney - Collection and Publication of Prosecutorial Information
ADDED: 8:29 AM
SB0471
Sen Washington (By Request)

Task Force to Study Crime Classification and Penalties - Alterations
ADDED: 8:29 AM
SB0479
Sen Smith

Public Safety - Access to Firearms - Storage Requirements (Jaelynn's Law)
ADDED: 8:29 AM
SB0505
Sen Hettleman

Criminal Law - First-Degree Child Abuse - Continuing Course of Conduct
ADDED: 8:29 AM

Change made: January 25, 2021 8:29 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Briefing
February 16, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
(Previous Location: Virtual Meeting)

Change made: January 25, 2021 8:29 AM - HEARING ADDED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
February 16, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0495
Sen Cassilly

Reckless and Negligent Driving - Death of Another - Must-Appear Violation
SB0501
Sen Beidle

Towing or Removal of Vehicles From Parking Lots – Placement of Signs – Regional Malls

Change made: January 25, 2021 8:29 AM - HEARING ADDED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
February 17, 2021 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0494
Sen West, et al

Juveniles Convicted as Adults - Sentencing - Limitations and Reduction (Juvenile Restoration Act)
SB0497
Sen Kelley, et al

Juvenile Services Education Board and Program – Establishment, Powers, and Duties

House
Environment and Transportation Committee
Change made: January 25, 2021 9:52 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
January 27, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0196
Del Ivey

Environment – Oil and Natural Gas Produced by Hydraulic Fracturing – Prohibition on Exportation
REMOVED: 9:52 AM

Government Operations and Health Facilities Subcommittee
Change made: January 25, 2021 10:33 AM - HEARING ADDED
Government Operations and Health Facilities Subcommittee - Work Session
January 27, 2021 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
-HB 130, HB 297, HB 390

Health Occupations and Long-Term Care Subcommittee
Change made: January 25, 2021 9:56 AM - HEARING ADDED
Health Occupations and Long-Term Care Subcommittee - Work Session
January 28, 2021 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
HB 135, HB 141, HB 233

Natural Resources, Agriculture & Open Space Subcommittee
Change made: January 25, 2021 8:27 AM - HEARING ADDED
Natural Resources, Agriculture & Open Space Subcommittee - Work Session
January 26, 2021 5:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Change made: January 25, 2021 9:24 AM - HEARING ADDED
Natural Resources, Agriculture & Open Space Subcommittee - Work Session
January 26, 2021 5:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Ways and Means Committee
Change made: January 25, 2021 10:25 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
January 27, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0417
Del Adams

Education - Public Schools - Required Number of School Days or Hours
REMOVED: 10:25 AM

Other
Anne Arundel
Change made: January 25, 2021 11:05 AM - HEARING ADDED
Anne Arundel - Other
January 29, 2021 8:30 AM
Zoom / YouTube

No. 11 - Baltimore City
Change made: January 25, 2021 7:27 AM - HEARING ADDED
No. 11 - Baltimore City - Other
February 1, 2021 6:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Baltimore City Senate Delegation Meeting with Baltimore City Stakeholders.

Change made: January 25, 2021 7:28 AM - HEARING ADDED
No. 11 - Baltimore City - Other
February 5, 2021 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Baltimore City Senate Delegation Meeting with Baltimore City Stakeholders

No. 4 - Baltimore County
Change made: January 25, 2021 9:27 AM - HEARING ADDED
No. 4 - Baltimore County - Other
January 27, 2021 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube