Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Open Government

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0076 /CH0368
Title
Baltimore County Board of Education - Education Transparency Act
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0352 (SB0295)
Title
Transparency Act of 2018
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0704
Title
General Assembly - Live and Archived Video Streaming of Meetings
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0295 (HB0352)
Title
Transparency Act of 2018
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0396 /CH0546
Title
Open Meetings Act - Training - Application
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0984
Title
General Provisions - Open Meetings Act - Application to Governor's Cabinet and Governor's Executive Council
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0076 /CH0368 Baltimore County Board of Education - Education Transparency Act Baltimore County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368
Ways and Means
2/01/2018 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/04/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0352 (SB0295) Transparency Act of 2018 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/19/2018 - 3:00 PM
HB0704 General Assembly - Live and Archived Video Streaming of Meetings Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/26/2018 - 3:00 PM
SB0295 (HB0352) Transparency Act of 2018 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0396 /CH0546 Open Meetings Act - Training - Application Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 546
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2018 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0984 General Provisions - Open Meetings Act - Application to Governor's Cabinet and Governor's Executive Council Senator Zucker 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:50 PM