Day(s)
As of: 4/26/2024 8:26:31 AM
Created: 1/14/2020 10:30 AM
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
(Added - 1/15/2020 2:49 PM)
(Added - 1/20/2020 10:43 AM)
Sen McCray
Electronic Smoking Devices, Other Tobacco Products, and Cigarettes - Taxation and Regulation
(Added - 1/20/2020 10:43 AM)
(Added - 1/20/2020 10:43 AM)
(Added - 1/20/2020 10:43 AM)
(Added - 1/20/2020 10:43 AM)
(Added - 1/20/2020 10:43 AM)
(Added - 1/21/2020 12:20 PM)
(Added - 1/21/2020 12:20 PM)
(Added - 1/21/2020 12:20 PM)
(Added - 1/21/2020 12:20 PM)
(Added - 1/22/2020 1:27 PM)
Created: 1/15/2020 10:59 AM
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Sen Simonaire, et al
Local Government – Animal Control Facilities – Adoption Fee Waiver for Veterans
(Pets for Vets Act of 2020)
Sen Simonaire, et al
Natural Resources - Recreational License Donation Program and Healing Hunting and Fishing Fund - Revisions
Sens Gallion and Bailey
State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners - Practicing Veterinary Medicine Without a License - Cease and Desist Order and Civil Penalty
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Judicial Proceedings)
(Added - 1/17/2020 12:18 PM)
(Added - 1/21/2020 11:05 AM)
(Added - 1/21/2020 11:05 AM)
(Removed - 1/15/2020 12:50 PM)
Created: 1/27/2020 11:42 AM
4:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0103 - Health Occupations - Diagnostic Evaluation and Treatment of Patients - Disciplinary Actions (The Patient's Access to Integrative Healthcare Act of 2020)
Created: 12/19/2019 3:22 PM
2:00 PM
-
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Briefing: Update of the Pharmaceutical Services Workgroup
Created: 1/17/2020 10:46 AM
2:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Or immediately following the 1:00 pm briefing
Briefing: Maryland Auto - Overview of Report from SB 856 of 2018
Created: 1/13/2020 2:16 PM
2:00 PM
-
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
2:45 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Or immediately following the 2:00 pm briefing
Sen Kagan
Consumer Protection - Scanning or Swiping Identification Cards and Driver's Licenses - Prohibition
Sen Lee, et al
Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges - County Government Consent Requirement - Expansion
(Added - 1/24/2020 9:51 AM)
(Removed - 1/27/2020 9:04 AM)
Created: 1/14/2020 12:00 PM
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Sen Elfreth, et al
Crimes - Hate Crimes - Use of an Item or a Symbol to Threaten or Intimidate
(Added - 1/17/2020 11:42 AM)
(Added - 1/17/2020 11:42 AM)
Sen Lee, et al
Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2020)
(Added - 1/17/2020 11:42 AM)
(Added - 1/17/2020 11:42 AM)
(Added - 1/17/2020 11:42 AM)
(Added - 1/23/2020 8:45 AM)
Canceled
Appropriations Committee - Briefing
11:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Office of the Public Defender on Foster Care
Created: 1/24/2020 9:54 AM
11:00 AM
-
House Office Building, Room 145, Annapolis, MD
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 145, Annapolis, MD
Office of the Public Defender on Foster Care
Created: 1/10/2020 2:36 PM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 145, Annapolis, MD
Created: 1/10/2020 2:36 PM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Created: 1/9/2020 10:08 AM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
Maryland Department of Transportation
Maryland Department of Transportation Priorities
Update on Howard Street Tunnel
Update on Third Chesapeake Bay Crossing
Review of MAGLEV and Hyperloop Projects
Highway Safety Update
(Added - 1/27/2020 3:25 PM)
Created: 1/9/2020 10:18 AM
2:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
Del Hartman, et al
Solid Waste Management - Prohibition on Releasing a Balloon Into the Atmosphere
(Added - 1/13/2020 11:40 AM)
Del Healey
Environment - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Inspections for Mold Hazards and Mold or Moisture Problems
(Removed - 1/9/2020 11:29 AM)
(Removed - 1/22/2020 12:07 PM)
Del Guyton, et al
Maryland Horse Industry Board - Breeding Stables and Horse Establishments - Definitions
(Removed - 1/28/2020 11:24 AM)
Created: 1/9/2020 10:29 AM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
The Health Services Cost Review Commission (HSCRC) on the Total Cost of Care (TCOC) Model and the Maryland Primary Care Program (MDPCP)
Created: 1/14/2020 1:50 PM
2:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
Del Rogers, et al
Department of Veterans Affairs - Homes for Veterans - Veterans of Uniformed Service
Dels Krebs and M. Jackson (By Request)
Commission to Advance Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland - Extension and Alteration
Del Carr, et al
Maryland Transportation Authority - Video Streaming and Archiving - Open Meetings
Created: 1/10/2020 3:49 PM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
Dels Crosby and Stewart
Immunities - Associations, Organizations, and Charities - Liability of Agents and Volunteers
(Added - 1/17/2020 1:17 PM)
Del Barron, et al
Human Relations - Employment Discrimination - Waiver of Immunity From Suit in Federal Court and Venue
(Removed - 1/17/2020 3:46 PM)
Created: 1/15/2020 2:58 PM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Del Long
Baltimore County - Homestead Property Tax Credit Notice - Lead Registry and Code Compliance - Pilot Program
Del Guyton, et al
Election Law - Voting Order Priority - Individuals Who Need Extra Assistance
(Added - 1/15/2020 4:41 PM)
(Added - 1/28/2020 3:58 PM)
(Removed - 1/22/2020 3:30 PM)
Briefing by the Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center
Created: 1/29/2020 10:23 AM
3:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Briefing by the Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center
Created: 12/30/2019 2:22 PM
10:00 AM - Governor's Reception Room, 2nd Floor State House, 100 State Circle, Annapolis, MD
General Meeting
Created: 1/23/2020 1:51 PM
Work Session
8:30 AM - Room 218 House Office Building, Howard County Delegation Room, 6 Bladen St., Annapolis, MD
Joint Work Session with the Senate Howard County Delegation - Select Committee No. 5.
Created: 12/20/2019 3:23 PM
1:30 PM to 3:30 PM - Community College of Baltimore County, Catonsville Campus Student Services Bldg., Room 4, Parking Lot #5, 800 S. Rolling Road, Catonsville, MD
Central Maryland Regional Listening Session
Created: 12/20/2019 3:23 PM
6:30 PM to 8:30 PM - Community College of Baltimore County, Catonsville Campus Student Services Bldg., Room 4, Parking Lot #5, 800 S. Rolling Road, Catonsville, MD
Central Maryland Regional Listening Session
Created: 1/23/2020 1:53 PM
Work Session
8:30 AM - Room 218 House Office Building, Howard County Delegation Room, 6 Bladen St., Annapolis, MD
Joint with the Howard County House Delegation