Day(s)
As of: 9/20/2024 11:25:21 PM
Created: 1/21/2020 12:20 PM
9:00 AM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
These bills are being heard before the Pensions Subcommittee
Sen Elfreth (Chr Jt Com on Pnsns)
Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Obsolete Reemployment Provisions
(Added - 1/23/2020 4:25 PM)
Sen Elfreth (Chr Jt Com on Pnsns)
State Retirement and Pension System - Death Benefits for Children - Age
(Added - 1/28/2020 10:46 AM)
Sen Elfreth (Chr Jt Com on Pnsns)
State Retirement Agency - Monitoring and Recording of Automated Outgoing Telephone Calls - Authorization
(Added - 1/28/2020 10:46 AM)
(Added - 1/29/2020 1:33 PM)
Created: 1/21/2020 12:20 PM
9:00 AM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Bill Hearings and Work Session
Created: 1/10/2020 2:36 PM
1:00 PM - Miller Senate Building, Schweinhaut Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
Created: 1/23/2020 1:07 PM
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Sen Kagan
Public Ethics - Executive Branch - Lobbying by Former Secretaries of Principal Departments (Shut the Revolving Door Act of 2020)
The Pres (Admin), et al
Occupational and Professional Licensing - Service Members, Veterans, and Military Spouses - Revisions to Reciprocity Requirements
(Added - 1/29/2020 12:33 PM)
(Added - 1/30/2020 8:48 AM)
(Removed - 1/24/2020 9:36 AM)
Created: 1/13/2020 2:16 PM
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Sen Cassilly, et al
Harford County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Administration - Transfer of Personnel
(Added - 1/15/2020 3:20 PM)
Sen Cassilly
Lodging Establishments - Accessible Rooms for Individuals With Disabilities - Bed Height
(Added - 1/15/2020 3:20 PM)
(Added - 1/15/2020 3:20 PM)
(Added - 1/15/2020 3:20 PM)
(Added - 1/17/2020 3:47 PM)
(Removed - 2/3/2020 2:13 PM)
Created: 1/21/2020 4:37 PM
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Sen West
Correctional Services - Pregnant Incarcerated Individuals - Substance Abuse Assessment and Treatment
(Added - 1/23/2020 8:45 AM)
The Pres (Admin), et al
State Commission on Criminal Sentencing Policy - Annual Report - Crimes of Violence (The Judicial Transparency Act of 2020)
The Pres (Admin), et al
Crimes - Firearms - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2020)
(Added - 1/23/2020 8:45 AM)
(Added - 1/31/2020 2:26 PM)
Sen Waldstreicher, et al
Foster Parents, Preadoptive Parents, and Caregivers - Right to Intervene
(Added - 1/31/2020 2:26 PM)
Created: 1/29/2020 11:39 AM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 150, Annapolis, MD
(Added - 1/30/2020 1:18 PM)
(Added - 1/30/2020 1:18 PM)
(Added - 1/30/2020 1:18 PM)
(Added - 1/30/2020 1:18 PM)
University System of Maryland Office
(Removed - 1/30/2020 1:18 PM)
USM Overview
(Removed - 1/30/2020 1:18 PM)
Created: 1/10/2020 2:36 PM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Created: 1/16/2020 3:11 PM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
(Jointly assigned to Economic Matters\Health and Government Operations)
Created: 1/17/2020 12:21 PM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
Dorchester County Delegation
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Hoopers Island
(Added - 1/21/2020 3:13 PM)
Del Carr
Motor Vehicle Administration - Authority to Suspend Registration for Violations Recorded by Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems - Repeal
Del Moon, et al
State Highway Administration - Construction and Maintenance - Permit Requirements (Nighttime Construction Noise Reduction Act)
Chr ENT (Dept)
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Deployed Military Personnel - Exemption
Chr ENT (Dept)
Motor Vehicles - Electronic Inspection Certificates for Used Vehicles - Sunset Extension
Chr ENT (Dept)
Transportation - Potomac River Bridges Towing Compact - Inclusion of Additional Bridges
Del Fraser-Hidalgo, et al
Maryland Zero Emission Electric Vehicle Infrastructure Council - Reporting, Membership, and Sunset Extension
The Spkr (Atty Gen Ofc), et al
Vehicle Laws - Suspension of Driver's License or Registration - Unpaid Citations or Judgments
(Removed - 2/3/2020 11:58 AM)
Created: 2/3/2020 12:38 PM
3:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
Motor Vehicle & Transportation Subcommittee Meeting
Created: 1/28/2020 6:00 PM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
Dels Reznik and Valderrama
Health Insurance - Prescription Insulin Drugs - Limits on Copayment and Coinsurance
Chr HGO
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Del Carr, et al
Health Insurance - Pediatric Autoimmune Neuropsychiatric Disorders - Coverage
Del Cullison
Health Occupations - Social Workers - Scope of Practice, Supervision, and Application Decision Appeal Process
Del Hettleman, et al
Department of Aging - Assisted Living Program Subsidies - Determinations
(Removed - 2/3/2020 11:44 AM)
Created: 1/21/2020 11:36 AM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
(Added - 1/22/2020 10:51 AM)
(Added - 1/22/2020 10:51 AM)
(Added - 1/24/2020 2:17 PM)
(Added - 1/24/2020 2:17 PM)
Del Pippy, et al
Criminal Procedure - Out of Court Statement of Child Victim - Neglect of a Minor
(Added - 1/24/2020 2:17 PM)
(Removed - 2/3/2020 8:05 PM)
Created: 1/20/2020 9:06 AM
Tuesday, February 4, 2020
1:00 PM
-
House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Del Cardin, et al
Election Law - Campaign Material - Definition and Authority Line for Telephone Calls
Del Long
Homestead Property Tax Credit Program - Notice of Eligibility - Lead Registry and Code Compliance
Dels Luedtke and Mosby
Election Law - Institutions of Higher Education - Voter Registration and Voting by Students (Student Voter Empowerment Act of 2020)
(Added - 1/21/2020 10:11 AM)
(Added - 1/21/2020 10:11 AM)
(Added - 1/21/2020 10:11 AM)
Charles County Delegation
Charles County - Tax Increment Financing and Special Taxing Districts
(Added - 1/21/2020 10:11 AM)
(Added - 1/21/2020 10:11 AM)
Del Washington, et al
Campaign Finance Entities - Officers - Repeal of Voter Registration Requirement
(Added - 1/23/2020 8:48 AM)
(Added - 1/23/2020 8:48 AM)
(Added - 1/23/2020 8:48 AM)
Del Long
Homestead Property Tax Credit - Calculation of Credit for Dwelling Purchased by First-Time Homebuyer
(Added - 1/23/2020 10:56 AM)
(Added - 1/23/2020 10:56 AM)
(Added - 1/23/2020 10:56 AM)
(Added - 1/23/2020 10:56 AM)
Prince George's County Delegation
Prince George's County - Ethics - Limitations on Applicant Campaign Contributions PG 407-20
(Removed - 2/6/2020 9:05 AM)
Created: 12/20/2019 3:42 PM
1:30 PM to 3:30 PM - Wicomico Youth and Civic Center, 500 Glen Avenue, Salisbury, MD
Lower Shore Regional Listening Session
Created: 12/20/2019 3:42 PM
6:30 PM to 8:30 PM - Wicomico Youth and Civic Center, 500 Glen Avenue, Salisbury, MD
Lower Shore Regional Listening Session
Created: 1/30/2020 11:26 AM
11:30 AM to 12:30 PM - Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
Baltimore City Delegation Meeting
Created: 1/2/2020 1:55 PM
9:00 AM to 12:00 PM - 7th Floor Board Room, Nancy S. Grasmick Education Bldg., 200 West Baltimore St., Baltimore, MD
To watch livestream
Click on "Town Hall Live Stream" under the appropriate date
Public Meeting to discuss normal IAC agenda business.
Additional meeting information will be available at iac.maryland.gov