Day(s)
As of: 4/24/2024 6:55:17 PM
Created: 1/10/2020 2:36 PM
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Created: 1/10/2020 2:36 PM
1:00 PM - Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
OLA DHS-FIA Audit
Created: 1/10/2020 2:36 PM
1:00 PM - Miller Senate Building, Schweinhaut Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
(Added - 2/3/2020 3:55 PM)
Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention
(Removed - 2/3/2020 3:55 PM)
Created: 1/31/2020 3:19 PM
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
The Pres (Admin), et al
State Government - Protection of Information - Revisions (Maryland Data Privacy Act)
Sen Kagan, et al
State Government - Open Meetings - Requirements and Application of Open Meetings Act (Maryland State Agency Transparency Act)
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Finance)
Sens Griffith and Hershey
Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants - Administration and Funding
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
Sens Kagan and Reilly
Public Information Act - Denial of Part of a Public Record - Victims and Witnesses
Sen Young
Pharmacists - Administration of Self-Administered Medications and Maintenance Injectable Medications
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Finance)
Sen Eckardt
Health Occupations - Nurse Practitioners - Certifications of Competency and Incapacity
Created: 1/17/2020 3:47 PM
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
(Added - 1/22/2020 11:49 AM)
Sen Washington, et al
Labor and Employment - Leave With Pay - Bereavement Leave (Family Bereavement Act)
(Added - 1/22/2020 11:49 AM)
(Jointly assigned to Finance\Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
(Added - 1/22/2020 11:49 AM)
(Added - 1/27/2020 12:28 PM)
(Added - 1/28/2020 4:14 PM)
(Added - 2/4/2020 2:46 PM)
Sen Young
Health Care Facilities - Hospitals and Related Institutions - Discrimination Protections
(Added - 2/4/2020 2:46 PM)
Sens Lam and Kelley
Electronic Smoking Devices - Added Flavoring - Prohibition on Shipping, Import, or Sale
(Removed - 2/13/2020 9:27 AM)
Created: 1/28/2020 2:39 PM
1:00 PM
-
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
12:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Bill hearings will begin at 12:00 pm or immediately following the Senate floor session.
Sen Serafini, et al
Possession of Medical Cannabis - Local Correctional Facilities and Home Detention Program - Prohibition
Sens Waldstreicher and West
Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Kits - Privacy, Reimbursement, and Notification
Sen Kramer, et al
Public Safety - Law Enforcement - Veterinary Care of Retired Law Enforcement K-9s Act
Sen Pinsky, et al
Public Safety – Mandatory Mental Health Training – First Responders and Law Enforcement Officers
Sen Kelley, et al
Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Citations in Lieu of Arrest
(Added - 1/29/2020 3:11 PM)
(Added - 1/29/2020 3:11 PM)
(Added - 1/29/2020 3:11 PM)
(Added - 1/29/2020 3:11 PM)
(Added - 2/6/2020 5:22 PM)
Sen Carter, et al
Driver's License Suspensions - Failure to Satisfy Judgment - Penalties and Assessment of Points
(Removed - 1/29/2020 3:11 PM)
Created: 2/7/2020 10:20 AM
3:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Briefing on the 2020 Census
Created: 1/10/2020 2:36 PM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 145, Annapolis, MD
Created: 1/10/2020 2:36 PM
4:30 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Capital Department of Veterans Affairs
(Removed - 1/28/2020 9:03 AM)
Created: 1/24/2020 5:09 PM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
(Added - 1/29/2020 5:01 PM)
Del R. Lewis, et al
Public Service Commission - Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Rapid Health Impact Assessment and Final Action
Del Cox, et al
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Solar Energy - Municipal Electric Utilities
(Added - 1/29/2020 10:12 AM)
Created: 1/21/2020 3:22 PM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
Del Korman, et al
State Highway Administration - Highway Work Permits - Pedestrian Access (Pedestrian Access Act of 2020)
Del Lehman, et al
Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges - County Government Consent Requirement - Expansion
Del Carr
Motor Vehicle Administration - Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems - Reciprocal Agreements
(Added - 1/28/2020 2:15 PM)
(Added - 1/28/2020 2:15 PM)
(Added - 1/28/2020 2:15 PM)
(Added - 1/28/2020 2:15 PM)
(Added - 1/28/2020 2:15 PM)
(Removed - 1/22/2020 9:09 AM)
Created: 2/11/2020 1:26 PM
3:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
Created: 2/11/2020 1:45 PM
3:30 PM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
Created: 2/4/2020 10:18 AM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
Del Carr
State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Board Membership and Provisional Licensing Requirements
Del Reznik
Insurance - Medicare Supplement Policy Plans - Open Enrollment Period Following Birthday
(Added - 2/4/2020 2:51 PM)
(Added - 2/6/2020 11:46 AM)
Del Pena-Melnyk
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Health Benefits - Required Participation in the Individual Exchange by Carriers
(Removed - 2/12/2020 2:24 PM)
Del Carr
State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Renaming and Licensure of Assisted Living Managers
(Removed - 2/13/2020 8:57 AM)
Created: 2/10/2020 3:19 PM
Health Occupations and Long-Term Care Subcommittee - Bill Hearing
11:20 AM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
Dels Krebs and Pena-Melnyk
Health Occupations - Morticians and Funeral Directors - Apprenticeships
Chr HGO
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Created: 1/28/2020 2:22 PM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
Del Atterbeary, et al
Courts - Juvenile Court - Waiver of Jurisdiction - Victim Impact Statement
(Added - 1/30/2020 7:27 PM)
Del Crutchfield, et al
Criminal Law – Sexual Crimes – Repeal of Spousal Defense
(Love Is No Defense to Sexual Crimes)
(Added - 1/29/2020 11:06 AM)
(Added - 1/29/2020 11:06 AM)
(Added - 1/29/2020 11:06 AM)
Chr JUD (Dept)
Family Law - Investigation of Suspected Child Abuse and Neglect - Preliminary Report to State's Attorney
(Added - 1/29/2020 11:06 AM)
Chr JUD (Dept)
Children in Need of Assistance - Qualified Residential Treatment Program - Definition
(Added - 1/29/2020 11:06 AM)
(Added - 1/29/2020 11:06 AM)
(Added - 1/30/2020 7:27 PM)
Created: 2/4/2020 9:48 AM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Carroll County Delegation
Carroll County - Education - Junior Reserve Officer Training Corps Instructors
Del Johnson, et al
Education - Sexual Abuse and Assault Awareness and Prevention Program - Human and Sex Trafficking
Del Forbes, et al
State Libraries - Library for the Blind and Physically Handicapped and State Library Board - Alterations
Created: 2/7/2020 9:50 AM
11:30 AM to 12:30 PM - Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
Meeting of the Baltimore City Senate Delegation
Created: 10/23/2019 10:42 AM
9:00 AM - 1st Floor Conference Room, Side B, 100 Community Place, Crownsville, MD
Monthly Meeting